EP2586715 - Feeding unit for feeding sealed packs of pourable food products and packaging machine comprising such a feeding unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/18] | Feeding unit and method for feeding sealed packs of pourable food products | ||
[2013/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2014/26] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance S.A. Avenue Général-Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedretti, Richard Via Bergamo, 16 41043 Casinalbo di Formigine / IT | 02 /
Fontanazzi, Paolo Via Fratelli Cairoli, 55/3 41125 Modena / IT | 03 /
Rimondi, Fabrizio Via Scania, 1159/A 40024 Castel San Pietro Terme / IT | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 22186 Lund / SE | ||
Former [2014/19] | Leonelli, Pietro Tetra Pak Packaging Solutions S.p.A. Legal Affairs Dept. Via Antonio Delfini 1 41123 Modena (IT) / IT | ||
Former [2013/49] | Di Sciuva, Michele, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2013/18] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11187354.3 | 31.10.2011 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586715 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586715 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/52, B65B61/28, B65G19/02, B65G19/22, B65G19/24 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
B65G19/02 (EP,US);
B65B43/52 (EP,US);
B65B61/28 (EP,US);
B65G19/225 (EP,US);
B65G19/245 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Title | German: | Zuführeinheit zum Zuführen von versiegelten Verpackungen von gießbaren Lebensmittelprodukten sowie Verpackungsmaschine mit einer solchen Zuführeinheit | [2013/47] | English: | Feeding unit for feeding sealed packs of pourable food products and packaging machine comprising such a feeding unit | [2013/47] | French: | Unité d'alimentation de paquets scellés de produits alimentaires pouvant être versés et machine d'emballage comprenant une telle unité | [2013/47] |
Former [2013/18] | Zuführeinheit und Verfahren zum Zuführen von versiegelten Verpackungen von gießbaren Lebensmittelprodukten | ||
Former [2013/18] | Feeding unit and method for feeding sealed packs of pourable food products | ||
Former [2013/18] | Unité d'alimentation et procédé d'alimentation de paquets scellés de produits alimentaires pouvant être versés | Examination procedure | 27.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 14.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2011 | AL | 25.06.2014 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | RS | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | IE | 31.10.2014 | LU | 31.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 31.10.2011 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
IE | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
LU | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
RS | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]EP0887261 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [ID] 10 * the whole document * [A] 1-9; | [A]GB1016924 (HESSER AG MASCHF) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0887261 |