EP2449895 - Device for producing coaxial filters for smokeable rod shaped articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau GmbH Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2016/29] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states HAUNI Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tons, Gunnar Voßbarg 39 25421 Pinneberg / DE | 02 /
Wolff, Stephan Sniedersloop 3 21509 Glinde / DE | 03 /
Meyer, Ralf Am Silberberg 23 29581 Gerdau/Bohlsen / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11187373.3 | 01.11.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | DE20101043348 | 03.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043348 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2449895 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2449895 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
A24D3/0204 (EP);
A24D3/0233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] |
Former [2012/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Koaxialfiltern für stabförmige Rauchartikel | [2012/19] | English: | Device for producing coaxial filters for smokeable rod shaped articles | [2012/19] | French: | Dispositif de fabrication de filtres coaxiales pour des articles à fumer en forme de tiges | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 18.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/47] | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0638248 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [US]) [X] 1,3,4,17-21 * column 6, lines 18-48 * [Y] 1,3-9,17-21 [I] 5,8,9; | [Y]DE4240089 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 27 *; | [X]US4648858 (LEWIS ROBERT T [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,17-21 * column 2, line 61 - column 6, line 27 *; | [YA]EP1847186 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-9,17-21 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040] * [A] 10; | [YA]EP1847187 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3-9,17-21 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0067] * [A] 10; | [A]DE552227 (AMERICAN MACH & FOUNDRY) [A] 25 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * | by applicant | US3396061 | other | EP0638248 | JPS5449398 | JPS5449398K | US5012829 | EP1847187 | EP1847186 |