Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
05.02.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.08.2013 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
30.08.2013 | First examination report | |
16.11.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] |
14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.05.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |