EP2450265 - System for stabilising a towed vehicle hitched to a towing vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jtekt Europe Z. I. du Broteau 69540 Irigny / FR | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantale, David 169 Route du Cherest 69126 Brindas / FR | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11187696.7 | 03.11.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | FR20100059077 | 04.11.2010 Original published format: FR 1059077 | [2012/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450265 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/15, B62D13/00 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
B62D13/00 (EP);
B62D7/159 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stabilisationssystem eines Fahrzeugs zum Ziehen, das an ein Zugfahrzeug angehängt ist | [2012/19] | English: | System for stabilising a towed vehicle hitched to a towing vehicle | [2012/19] | French: | Système de stabilisation d' un véhicule à tracter attelé à un véhicule tracteur | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4127750 (MERCEDES-BENZ AG) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 13; figure 1 *; | [X]US2007152424 (DENG WEIWEN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8 * abstract *; | [X]US2006229782 (DENG WEIWEN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,2 * |