EP2450407 - Polypropylene carbonate containing sound-absorbing mass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brym, Anna Katharina Emil-Heckel-Str. 20a 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Steinke, Tobias Heinz Viehtriftstrasse 35b 67346 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Görtz, Hans-Helmut Am Wurmberg 11 67251 Freinsheim / DE | 04 /
Weiss, Axel Brahmsweg 3 67346 Speyer / DE | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/19] | Application number, filing date | 11187705.6 | 03.11.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | EP20100190353 | 08.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10190353 | [2012/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2450407 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2450407 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L33/06, C08L69/00, C09D169/00, B60R13/08 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
C08K3/34 (EP);
C08L33/06 (EP);
C08L33/10 (EP);
C08L69/00 (EP);
C09D169/00 (EP);
G10K11/162 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/34, C08L33/06 (EP);
C08L69/00, C08K3/34, C08L33/06 (EP);
C09D169/00, C08K3/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | C08L33/06, C08L69/00, C09D169/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antidröhnmasse enthaltend Polypropylencarbonat | [2012/19] | English: | Polypropylene carbonate containing sound-absorbing mass | [2012/19] | French: | Couche de protection anti-bruit comprenant du carbonate de polypropylène | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/03] | 24.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4874030 (KUPHAL JEFFREY A [US], et al) [X] 7 * column 6, line 29 - line 63; claims 4-6 *; | [X]JP2007217611 ; | JP2007217611 [ ] (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM); | [AD]WO2007034933 (NIHON TOKUSHU TORYO CO LTD [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10; | [A]US2006003104 (CHAO TIEN-CHIEH [US], et al) [A] 1-10; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 80, Database accession no. 2007-864574, XP002688242 & JP2007217611 A 20070830 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,4-6 * abstract * | [A] - CHUNG D.D.L., "Review Materials for vibration damping", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 36, pages 5733 - 5737, XP002688243 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012999616049 | by applicant | WO03029325 | WO2006061237 | WO2007125039 | US4789727 | US7304172 | EP0081083 | WO2007034933 | - JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (2001), vol. 36, pages 5733 - 5737 | - SOGA ET AL., POLYMER JOURNAL, (1981), vol. 13, pages 407 - 10 | EP20100173414 | EP20100170428 |