EP2451089 - Multi-carrier satellite network supporting heterogeneous terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd. 21 Yegia Kapayim St. Kiryat Arye 49130 Petah-Tikva / IL | [2016/11] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd. 21, Yegla Kapayim Street Kiryat Arye 49130 Petah Tikva / IL | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Gilat Satellite Networks, Ltd. 21, Yegla Kapayim Street Kiryat Arye 49130 Petah Tikva / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lever, Dubi 14 Ha'arbel St. POB 3045 73127 Hashmonaim / IL | 02 /
Levinberg, Amiram 5 Mozes St. 52588 Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
Avitzour, Avraham 28 Mevoe-Hchoresh St. 90836 Har-Adar / IL | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Keseris, Denis, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2012/19] | Wallin, Nicholas James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11187764.3 | 03.11.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | US20100411093P | 08.11.2010 Original published format: US 411093 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2451089 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2451089 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451089 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185, H04B7/204 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H04B7/18515 (EP,US);
H04B7/18541 (EP,US);
H04B7/2045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | H04B7/185 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] |
Former [2012/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mehrträger-Satellitennetzwerk mit Unterstützung heterogener Endgeräte | [2012/19] | English: | Multi-carrier satellite network supporting heterogeneous terminals | [2012/19] | French: | Réseau satellite multi-porteur supportant des terminaux hétérogènes | [2012/19] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/36] | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2011 | AL | 27.01.2016 | AT | 27.01.2016 | BE | 27.01.2016 | CY | 27.01.2016 | CZ | 27.01.2016 | DK | 27.01.2016 | EE | 27.01.2016 | ES | 27.01.2016 | FI | 27.01.2016 | HR | 27.01.2016 | IT | 27.01.2016 | LT | 27.01.2016 | LV | 27.01.2016 | MC | 27.01.2016 | MK | 27.01.2016 | NL | 27.01.2016 | PL | 27.01.2016 | RO | 27.01.2016 | RS | 27.01.2016 | SE | 27.01.2016 | SI | 27.01.2016 | SK | 27.01.2016 | SM | 27.01.2016 | TR | 27.01.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.04.2016 | GR | 28.04.2016 | IS | 27.05.2016 | PT | 27.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.11.2011 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
TR | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.11.2011 | |
AT | 27.01.2016 | ||
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CY | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
MC | 27.01.2016 | ||
MK | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SI | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
BE | 27.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
CZ | 27.01.2016 | ||
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RO | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
SK | 27.01.2016 | ||
SM | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
EE | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
DK | 27.01.2016 | ||
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LV | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
RS | 27.01.2016 | ||
SE | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.05.2016 | ||
PT | 27.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 27.01.2016 | |
ES | 27.01.2016 | ||
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
IT | 27.01.2016 | ||
LT | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
PL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 27.01.2016 | |
FI | 27.01.2016 | ||
HR | 27.01.2016 | ||
NL | 27.01.2016 | ||
NO | 27.04.2016 | ||
GR | 28.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 27.01.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2088691 (GILAT SATELLITE NETWORKS LTD [IL]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 20] , [0 33] , [0 48] , [0 50] , [0 54] * [A] 2-15; | [AP]WO2011080299 (THRANE & THRANE AS [DK], et al) [AP] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004010610 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0012]; claims 1-32 *; | [A]WO03036999 (COMSAT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * |