EP2453257 - Enhancing quality of ultrasound image in ultrasound system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. 114, Yangdukwon-ri Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon do 250-875 / KR | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jeong Sik 3 Fl., R&D Center Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong, Gangnam-gu 135-851 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Han, Song Yi 3 Fl., R&D Center Samsung Medison Co., Ltd. Medison Building 1003 Daechi-dong, Gangnam-gu 135-851 Seoul / KR | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Schmid, Wolfgang Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11187789.0 | 04.11.2011 | [2012/20] | Priority number, date | KR20100111371 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100111371 | KR20100111372 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100111372 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2453257 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2453257 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G06T5/20 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G01S7/52046 (EP,US);
A61B8/5269 (EP,US);
G01S7/52077 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T5/73 (EP,US);
G01S15/8995 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10132 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Qualitätsverbesserung eines Ultraschallbildes in einem Ultraschallsystem | [2012/20] | English: | Enhancing quality of ultrasound image in ultrasound system | [2012/20] | French: | Amélioration de la qualité d'une image ultrasonore dans un système ultrasonore | [2012/20] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/14] | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2016 | 07.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/18] | 18.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/18] | Divisional application(s) | EP13158377.5 / EP2605035 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - HOLGER HEWENER AND ROBERT LEMOR, "Deconvolution of Medical Ultrasound Data with Consideration of the Pressure Field, the Excitation Pulse and Focussing", ADVANCES IN MEDICAL ENGINEERING, SPRINGER, DE, (20070101), vol. 114, doi:10.1007/978-3-540-68764-1_26, ISBN 978-3-540-68763-4, pages 157 - 162, XP009157236 [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * * Sections 1. to 5. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-68764-1_26 | [X] - HEWENER H J ET AL, "Deconvolution of freehand 3d ultrasound data using improved reconstruction techniques in consideration of ultrasound point spread functions", 4TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE OF THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION FOR MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING : ECIFMBE 2008,, (20080101), vol. 22, pages 436 - 439, XP009157311 [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * * page 436, column rh * * page 437, column rh - page 439, column rh * | [X] - TAXT T ET AL, "Noise robust two-dimensional blind deconvolution of ultrasound images", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 IEEE TORONTO, ONT., CANADA 5-8 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971005), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.1997.661853, ISBN 978-0-7803-4153-1, pages 1465 - 1470, XP010271463 [X] 1-3,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1997.661853 | [X] - VOLLMANN W, "Resolution Enhancement of Ultrasonic B-Scan Images by Deconvolution", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SONICS AND ULTRASONICS, IEEE, US, (19820301), vol. 29, no. 2, doi:10.1109/T-SU.1982.31311, ISSN 0018-9537, pages 78 - 82, XP011404426 [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * * Sections I.-III. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/T-SU.1982.31311 | [A] - J.A. JENSEN ET AL, "Calculation of pressure fields from arbitrarily shaped, apodized, and excited ultrasound transducers", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ULTRASONICS, FERROELECTRICS AND FREQUENCY CONTROL, (19920301), vol. 39, no. 2, doi:10.1109/58.139123, ISSN 0885-3010, pages 262 - 267, XP055022120 [A] 1-3,9-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/58.139123 |