EP2431358 - Method of preparing a factor XA inhibitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grant, Craig South Lodge South Street Risby Suffolk IP28 6QU / GB | 02 /
Kanter, James P. 9591 Alcosta Blvd San Ramon, CA California 94583 / US | 03 /
Langlands, Graeme 44 Northfield Park Soham, Cambridgeshire CB7 5UZ / GB | [2012/26] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
Grant, Craig 10 Burgley Rise Burwell, CB5 0LW / GB | ||
02 /
Kanter, James P. 9591 Alcosta Blvd San Ramon, CA California 94583 / US | |||
03 /
Langlands, Graeme 44 Northfield Park Soham, Cambridgeshire CB7 5UZ / GB | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/12] | Application number, filing date | 11187927.6 | 07.11.2006 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | US20050735224P | 08.11.2005 Original published format: US 735224 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431358 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/75, A61K31/44 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K31/616 (EP,US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Herstellverfahren für einem Faktor-XA-Inhibitor | [2012/12] | English: | Method of preparing a factor XA inhibitor | [2012/12] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un inhibiteur du facteur XA | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 14.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/47] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06837238.2 / EP1948608 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IDY]US6376515 (ZHU BING-YAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Column 331, example 206; Column 224, lines 8-10, 16-22. * [Y] 1-15; | [IDY]US6844367 (ZHU BING-YAN [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Column 198, example 266; column 64, lines 22-24, 30-36. * [Y] 1-15; | [Y] - ZHANG ET AL., "Design, synthesis, and SAR of anthranilamide-based factor Xa inhibitors incorporating substituted biphenyl P4 motifs", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20040223), vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2003.11.079, pages 983 - 987, XP002471265 [Y] 1-15 * Page 985, scheme 4, step d. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2003.11.079 | [Y] - JIA ET AL., "1-(2-Naphthyl)-1H-pyrazole-5-carboxylamides as potent factor Xa inhibitors. part 2: A survey of P4 motifs", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20040101), vol. 14, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2003.12.053, pages 1221 - 1227, XP002408687 [Y] 1-15 * Page 1225, scheme 3, step g. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2003.12.053 | by applicant | WO9413693 | WO9721437 | EP0798295 | US5735105 | WO9828269 | WO9910316 | US6376515 | US6835739 | US6844367 | - ERIKSSON, QUINLAN, DRUGS, (2006), vol. 11, pages 1411 - 1429 | - COUGHLIN, J., THROMBOSIS HAEMOSTASIS, (2005), vol. 3, pages 1800 - 1814 | - MANN ET AL., J. THROMBOSIS. HAEMOSTASIS, (2003), vol. 1, pages 1504 - 1514 | - MANN ET AL., BLOOD, (1990), vol. 76, no. L, pages 1 - 16 | - TURPIE ET AL., ARCHIVES INTERNAL MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 162, no. 16, pages 1833 - 1840 |