EP2451127 - Progressive adaptive routing in a dragonfly processor interconnect network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/11] |
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054-1549 / US | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Cray Inc. 901 Fifth Avenue Seattle, WA 98164 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Mike 901 5th Avenue Seattle, WA Washington 98164 / US | 02 /
Scott, Steve 901 5th Avenue Seattle, WA Washington 98164 / US | 03 /
Cheng, Albert 901 5th Avenue Seattle, WA Washington 98164 / US | 04 /
Kim, John 901 5th Avenue Seattle, WA Washington 98164 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/03] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/19] | Granleese, Rhian Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11187952.4 | 04.11.2011 | [2012/19] | Priority number, date | US20100410636P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410636 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451127 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451127 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/715, H04L12/721, // H04L12/703, H04L12/707 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04B10/272 (US);
H04L45/06 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0005 (US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | H04L12/56, G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | Progressiv anpassungsfähiges Routing in einem Dragonfly-Interconnect-Netzwerk | [2014/46] | English: | Progressive adaptive routing in a dragonfly processor interconnect network | [2012/19] | French: | Acheminement adaptatif progressif dans un réseau d'interconnexion de processeur dragonfly | [2014/46] |
Former [2012/19] | Progressiv anpassungsfähige Routenvorgabe in einem Schlagfügelprozessor-Interconnect-Netzwerk | ||
Former [2012/19] | Acheminement adaptatif progressif dans un réseau d'interconnexion de processeur Dragonfly | Examination procedure | 09.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 19.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 28.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2011 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | IE | 04.11.2015 | LU | 04.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | FR | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 04.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 04.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008285562 (SCOTT STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0024] - [0131] *; | [X] - KIM J ET AL, "Technology-Driven, Highly-Scalable Dragonfly Topology", COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, 2008. ISCA '08. 35TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080621), ISBN 978-0-7695-3174-8, pages 77 - 88, XP031281669 [X] 1-15 * Chapters 3 and 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCA.2008.19 | [A] - PAUL GRATZ ET AL, "Regional congestion awareness for load balance in networks-on-chip", HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE, 2008. HPCA 2008. IEEE 14TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080216), ISBN 978-1-4244-2070-4, pages 203 - 214, XP031353634 [A] 1-15 * Chapter 4. * | [A] - MOJTABA VALINATAJ ET AL, "A fault-tolerant and congestion-aware routing algorithm for Networks-on-Chip", DESIGN AND DIAGNOSTICS OF ELECTRONIC CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (DDECS), 2010 IEEE 13TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100414), ISBN 978-1-4244-6612-2, pages 139 - 144, XP031694645 [A] 1-15 * Chapters II. and III. * |