EP2417930 - PESSARIES FOR PROLAPSE ALLEVIAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/07] | Pessaries for prolapse alleviat | ||
[2016/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConTIPI Medical Ltd. 2 Alon HaTavor Street Southern Industrial Park 38900 Caesarea / IL | [2014/38] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Contipi Ltd. 2 Alon Hatavor Street Southern Industrial Park 38900 Caesarea / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziv, Elan 8 Hallanot Street 52648 Ramat-Gan / IL | 02 /
Perle, Amir 18 Caspari Street 34677 Haifa / IL | 03 /
Sabo, Elisheva 32/7 HaNadivi Street 46485 Herzlia / IL | [2016/44] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
Ziv, Elan 8 HaIlanot Street 52648 Ramat-Gan / IL | ||
02 /
Perle, Amir 18 Caspari Street 34677 Haifa / IL | |||
03 /
Sabo, Elisheva 32/7 HaNadivi Street 46485 Herzlia / IL | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/44] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2012/07] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 11188150.4 | 23.04.2009 | [2012/07] | Priority number, date | US20080071344P | 23.04.2008 Original published format: US 71344 P | US20090417011 | 02.04.2009 Original published format: US 417011 | [2012/07] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009IL00443 | 23.04.2009 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2417930 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2417930 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417930 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F6/08, A61F6/12 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
A61F6/12 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2/005 (EP,US);
A61F6/08 (EP,RU,US);
A61F2/0027 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0003 (EP,US);
A61F2250/001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0039 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0065 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0071 (EP,US);
A61F2250/009 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/07] | Title | German: | PESSARE ZUR LINDERUNG EINES ORGANVORFALLS | [2016/26] | English: | PESSARIES FOR PROLAPSE ALLEVIAT | [2016/26] | French: | PESSAIRES POUR SOULAGEMENT DE PROLAPSUS | [2016/26] |
Former [2012/07] | Pessare zur Linderung eines Organvorfalls | ||
Former [2012/07] | Pessaries for prolapse alleviat | ||
Former [2012/07] | Pessaires pour soulagement de prolapsus | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 10.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09735573.9 / EP2276419 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2009 | AT | 02.11.2016 | BE | 02.11.2016 | CY | 02.11.2016 | CZ | 02.11.2016 | EE | 02.11.2016 | ES | 02.11.2016 | FI | 02.11.2016 | HR | 02.11.2016 | LT | 02.11.2016 | LV | 02.11.2016 | MC | 02.11.2016 | MK | 02.11.2016 | PL | 02.11.2016 | RO | 02.11.2016 | SI | 02.11.2016 | SK | 02.11.2016 | TR | 02.11.2016 | BG | 02.02.2017 | NO | 02.02.2017 | GR | 03.02.2017 | IS | 02.03.2017 | PT | 02.03.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | MT | 23.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
MK | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CY | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2009 | |
AT | 02.11.2016 | ||
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
MC | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SI | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
BG | 02.02.2017 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
BE | 02.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
SK | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
EE | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
RO | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
CZ | 02.11.2016 | ||
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 02.11.2016 | |
ES | 02.11.2016 | ||
FI | 02.11.2016 | ||
HR | 02.11.2016 | ||
LT | 02.11.2016 | ||
LV | 02.11.2016 | ||
PL | 02.11.2016 | ||
NO | 02.02.2017 | ||
GR | 03.02.2017 | ||
IS | 02.03.2017 | ||
PT | 02.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 02.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE271657 ; | [X]US5014722 (BAUER HANS A [DE]); | [X]WO2008010214 (CONTIPI LTD [IL], et al) |