EP2592805 - Method and system for preserving privacy and accountability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATS Group (IP Holdings) Limited 30 de Castro Street Wickhams Cay 1 P.O. Box 4519 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2014/32] |
Former [2014/20] | For all designated states ATS Group (IP Holdings) Limited PO Box 958 Pasea Estate Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states ATS Group (IP Holdings) Limited PO Box 958 Pasea Estate Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorecki, Christian@c/o AGT Group (R&D) GMBH Hilpertstrasse 20A 64295 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Zeiger, Florian@c/o AGT Group (R&D) GMBH Hilpertstrasse 20A 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 15 Old Bailey London EC4M 7EF / GB | ||
Former [2014/03] | Börner, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2013/49] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2013/20] | Bittner, Peter, et al Peter Bittner und Partner Seegarten 24 69190 Walldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11188153.8 | 08.11.2011 | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592805 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2592805 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
H04L63/045 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L63/0421 (EP,US);
H04L9/0825 (EP,US);
G06Q20/383 (EP,US);
H04L2209/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | 15.01.2014 | ME | 15.01.2014 | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Wahrung der Privatsphäre und Verantwortlichkeit | [2013/20] | English: | Method and system for preserving privacy and accountability | [2013/20] | French: | Procédé et système pour préserver la confidentialité et responsabilité | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 02.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2011 | AL | 14.05.2014 | AT | 14.05.2014 | BE | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | CZ | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | ES | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | IT | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | PL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | RS | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 08.11.2014 | LU | 08.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.05.2014 | ||
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 08.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 08.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
IT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
BE | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.05.2014 | |
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
ES | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
PL | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7181017 (NAGEL ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - line 51 * * column 13, line 21 - line 30 * * column 13, line 42 - line 46 * * column 14, line 8 - line 11 * * column 14, line 30 - line 32 * * column 15, line 22 - line 24 * * column 15, line 40 - line 45 * * column 15, line 65 - column 16, line 3 * * column 16, line 15 - line 34 * * column 16, line 48 - line 67 * * column 17, line 3 - line 25 * * column 26, line 34 - line 44 ** column 26, line 57 - column 27, line 8 *; | [A]US2007130070 (WILLIAMS JASON S [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figures 1,2a,3,6,7,8,9 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0117] * |