EP2442104 - Methods of evaluating cells and cell cultures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genzyme Corporation 500 Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rapko, Stephen M. 12 Island Road Franklin, MA 02038 / US | 02 /
Duguay, Stephen J. 117 Federal Street Salem, MA 01970 / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11188198.3 | 03.04.2008 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | US20070910574P | 06.04.2007 Original published format: US 910574 P | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442104 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2442104 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/68 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/5044 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/6887 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6844 (KR);
C12Q1/6851 (KR);
G01N2333/4722 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2400/40 (EP,KR,US);
G01N2800/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beurteilung von Zellen und Zellkulturen | [2012/16] | English: | Methods of evaluating cells and cell cultures | [2012/16] | French: | Procédés pour évaluer des cellules et des cultures cellulaires | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 10.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08733105.4 / EP2132562 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006094836 (EPIONTIS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 60 - page 63; example 3 * * claims 1,2,5-7,9 *; | [A] - STOKES ET AL, "Assessment of the gene expression profile of differentiated and dedifferentiated human fetal chondrocytes by microarray analysis", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, LIPPINCOTT, PHILADELPHIA, US, (20020201), vol. 46, no. 2, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 404 - 419, XP002253145 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * in particular: * * page 405, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 411, column R; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.10106 | [A] - MARLOVITS S ET AL, "Differential gene-expression of human articular chondrocytes and human fibroblasts in two- and three-dimensional cell culture", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, (20010307), vol. 15, no. 4, ISSN 0892-6638, page A34, XP008021552 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1096/fj.00-0237rev | [A] - KOLETTAS E ET AL, "Expression of cartilage-specific molecules is retained on long-term culture of human articular chondrocytes", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19950501), vol. 108, no. PART 5, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 1991 - 1999, XP002465823 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * abstract * * figures 3-5 * | [T] - RAPKO ET AL, "P195 Identification of dedifferentiated chondrocytes using gene expression - the dsc assay", OSTEOARTHRITIS AND CARTILAGE, BAILLIERE TINDALL,, LONDON, GB, (20070905), vol. 15, ISSN 1063-4584, page B137, XP022221713 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6150163 | US7169610 | - BASAD ET AL., Cartilage Surgery and Future Perspectives, THIEME VERLAG, (2003), pages 49 - 56 | - BRITTBERG ET AL., NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1994), vol. 331, no. 14, pages 889 - 895 | - BRITTBERG ET AL., CLIN. ORTHOPAED. REL. RES., (1999), vol. 367S, pages S147 - S155 | - BENYA, SHAFFER, CELL, (1982), vol. 30, pages 215 - 224 | - BINETTE ET AL., J. ORTHOPAED. RES., (1998), vol. 16, pages 207 - 216 | - LEMAIRE ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2005), vol. 52, no. 6, pages 1812 - 1823 | - LEUNG ET AL., TRENDS IN GENETICS, (2003), vol. 19, no. 11, pages 649 - 659 | - LINSENMEYER ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COM., (1980), vol. 92, no. 2, pages 440 - 6 | - RENO ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1997), vol. 22, pages 1082 - 6 | - LIU, W., SAINT, D.A., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 302, pages 52 - 59 | - "ABI Prism 7700 Sequence Detection System", LIVAK, K.J, User Bulletin 2, ABI PUBLICATION, (1997), page 4303859 | US20060805307 |