Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9456738 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2016 | B2 | US2012165627 | 28.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010287566 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5371946B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2013 | B2 | JP2012130629 | 12.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010287566 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2468186 | Global Dossier | 25.12.2019 | B1 | EP2468186 | 27.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010287566 | 24.12.2010 |