EP2592709 - Method and device for controlling the stability of a low voltage network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAG GmbH Pittlerstrasse 44 63225 Langen / DE | For all designated states Zdrallek, Markus Theodor-Noa-Str. 10 57074 Siegen / DE | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zdrallek, Markus Theodor-Noa-Str. 10 57074 Siegen / DE | 02 /
Stiegler, Martin Seebenseestr. 4 81377 München / DE | [2016/39] |
Former [2013/20] | 01 /
Zdrallek, Markus Theodor-Neu-Strasse 10 57074 Siegen / DE | ||
02 /
Stiegler, Martin Seebenseestrasse 4 München / DE | Representative(s) | Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Rohmann, Michael Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11188306.2 | 08.11.2011 | [2013/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2592709 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2592709 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/14, H02J3/38, // H02J7/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/14 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02J2300/20 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J2310/60 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02B70/3225 (EP);
Y02E10/56 (EP);
Y02E10/76 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T90/167 (EP);
Y04S20/222 (EP);
Y04S20/242 (EP);
Y04S30/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | H02J3/14, H02J3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2013/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung der Stabilität eines Niederspannungsnetzes | [2013/20] | English: | Method and device for controlling the stability of a low voltage network | [2013/20] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de commande de la stabilité d'un réseau basse tension | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 20.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.04.2016 | 27.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | IE | 08.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 08.11.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 08.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.11.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 08.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 08.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | DK | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | DK | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | EE | 28.09.2016 | |
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2006259199 (GJERDE JAN O [NO], et al) [I] 1,11 * abstract * * figures 1,3,4-8,14 *; | [A]WO2009019306 (KAESTLE GUNNAR [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, lines 6-20 ** page 5, line 25 - page 7, line 28 *; | [A]US2009265042 (MOLLENKOPF JAMES D [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0052] - [0053] *; | [A]DE102008057563 (INST SOLARE ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSTECHNIK ISET [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0021] - [0030] *; | [X]WO2011076887 (RWTH AACHEN [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 2, lines 8-14 * * page 5, lines 24-28 * * page 7, lines 1-10 *; | [I]US2011251732 (SCHWEITZER III EDMUND O [US], et al) [I] 1,3,5,7,9-11 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0034] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0071] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0095] *; | [A] - BJORN GWISDORF ET AL, "Technical and economic evaluation of voltage regulation strategies for distribution grids with a high amount of fluctuating dispersed generation units", INNOVATIVE TECHNOLOGIES FOR AN EFFICIENT AND RELIABLE ELECTRICITY SUPPLY (CITRES), 2010 IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100927), ISBN 978-1-4244-6076-2, pages 8 - 14, XP031788499 [A] 1-11 | Examination | DE1271802 | US2006279884 |