EP2455138 - Training system, mobile terminal and training method for a person [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Stefan Zum Flutgraben 9 12529 Schönefeld / DE | 02 /
John, Michael Esmarchstraße 17 10407 Berlin / DE | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Gross, Felix Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11188476.3 | 09.11.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | DE20101060592 | 16.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010060592 | [2012/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2455138 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63B24/00, A61B5/11, G06F3/01, G06K9/00, // A63B71/06 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/0002 (EP);
A61B5/11 (EP);
A63B24/0006 (EP);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/015 (EP);
G06F3/0304 (EP);
A61B2505/09 (EP);
A61B5/01 (EP);
A61B5/02 (EP);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A63B2024/0012 (EP);
A63B2024/0015 (EP);
A63B2024/0081 (EP);
A63B2071/0625 (EP);
A63B2071/0627 (EP);
A63B2071/0655 (EP);
A63B2071/068 (EP);
A63B2220/40 (EP);
A63B2220/50 (EP);
A63B2220/806 (EP);
A63B2225/10 (EP);
A63B2225/20 (EP);
A63B2225/50 (EP);
A63B2230/06 (EP);
A63B2230/062 (EP);
A63B2230/30 (EP);
A63B2230/305 (EP);
A63B2230/436 (EP);
A63B2230/438 (EP);
A63B2230/50 (EP);
A63B24/0075 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Trainingssystem, mobiles Endgerät und Trainingsverfahren für eine Person | [2012/21] | English: | Training system, mobile terminal and training method for a person | [2012/21] | French: | Système d'entraînement, terminal mobile et procédé d'entraînement pour une personne | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 22.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010084452 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 32 - page 8, line 13; figure - *; | [X]WO2008055949 (KHYMEIA S R L [IT], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02095714 (LOESCHINGER JUERGEN [DE]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 8; figure - * * page 11, line 25 - page 24, line 32; figure + *; | [X]WO2010085476 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 12, line 12 - line 21 * * page 17, line 22 - page 26, line 5 * * page 43, line 21 - page 45, line 19; figure - *; | [XI]EP1123686 (WERK ROLAND DR MED DIPL BIOL [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,9-11 * the whole document * [I] 4,6-8,12,13; | [XP]EP2383021 (TECHNOGYM SPA [IT]) [XP] 1-5,7-13 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0112] * * paragraph [0234]; figure - * | by applicant | DE202008011251U | EP2156815 | WO2010108170 | WO2010092089 | WO2010085476 | WO2010085111 | EP2241302 | WO2010083542 | WO2010054447 |