EP2439660 - Data synchronization protocol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCarthy, Brendan A. 35 Park Street San Francisco, CA California 94110 / US | 02 /
Guenther, Carston 4149 23rd Street San Francisco, CA California 94114 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Wardle, Callum Tarn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11188486.2 | 03.03.2009 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | US20080042283 | 04.03.2008 Original published format: US 42283 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439660 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439660 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H04L67/1097 (EP,US);
G06F9/52 (KR);
G06F16/27 (EP,GB,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F17/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Datensynchronisierungsprotokoll | [2012/15] | English: | Data synchronization protocol | [2012/15] | French: | Protocole de synchronisation de données | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 08.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09154256.3 / EP2098963 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090154256) is 20.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1291770 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [I] - APPLE, "Sync Services Programming Guide", Cupertino, CA95014, (20071031), COCOA > SYNCING, URL: http://developer.apple.com/documentation/Cocoa/Conceptual/SyncServices/SyncServices.pdf, (20090615), XP002532278 [I] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - APPLE, "Sync Services Framework Reference", (20071031), COCOA > SYNCING, URL: http://developer.apple.com/documentation/Cocoa/Reference/SyncServicesRef_ObjC/SyncServicesRef_ObjC.pdf, (20090615), XP002532279 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "SyncML Sync Protocol, version 1.0.1", INTERNET CITATION, (20010615), URL: http://www.openmobilealliance.org/tech/affiliates/syncml/syncml_protocol_v101_20010615.pdf, (20010615), XP002369966 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON ET AL, "SyncML REPRESENTATION PROTOCOL, VERSION 1.0.1", SYNCML REPRESENTATION PROTOCOL, XX, XX, (20010615), pages 1 - 105, XP002977306 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |