Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8872397 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2012146434 | 14.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2010275061 | 09.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5282780B | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B2 | JP2012125080 | 28.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010275061 | 09.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102570655 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2010275061 | 09.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2463990 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2020 | B1 | EP2463990 | 21.12.2016 | A3 | EP2463990 | 13.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2010275061 | 09.12.2010 |