EP2456227 - Data collection from utility meters over advanced metering infrastructure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2019 [2019/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Olst, Terry Lee 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
Koliwad, Ajay Hanumantrao 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11189263.4 | 15.11.2011 | [2012/21] | Priority number, date | US20100952490 | 23.11.2010 Original published format: US 952490 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2456227 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2456227 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2012/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Datenerfassung von Verbrauchszählern über eine verbesserte Messinfrastruktur | [2012/21] | English: | Data collection from utility meters over advanced metering infrastructure | [2012/21] | French: | Collecte de données à partir de compteurs utilitaires sur une infrastructure de mesure avancée | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2011 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 01.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/45] | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008177678 (DI MARTINI PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 20 - paragraph 21 * * page 7, paragraph 109 - paragraph 112 * * claim 16 *; | [XI]WO2009067251 (TRILLIANT NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,12 * page 4, paragraph 5 * * page 11, paragraph 44 - page 12, paragraph 49 * * page 21, paragraph 109 - paragraph 112 * [I] 2-4,6-11,13-15 |