12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
18.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.05.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.01.2014 |
First examination report |
|
25.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
19.11.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.05.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] |