Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2455116 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | B1 | EP2455116 | 23.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20102157 | 23.11.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1402885 | 27.09.2013 | B1 | ITMI20102157 | 24.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20102157 | 23.11.2010 |