EP2420950 - Information processing system, information processing method, information processing program, computer readable medium and computer data signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 7-3 Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Kazuo c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kamei, Mitsuhisa c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Ishima, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 15F Roppongi-T-cube 3-1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/25] | 01 /
Saito, Kazuo c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kamei, Mitsuhisa c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ishima, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 15F Roppongi-T-cube 3-1-1, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-0032 / JP | |||
Former [2012/08] | 01 /
Saito, Kazuo c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kamei, Mitsuhisa c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1-1, Roppongi 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Ishima, Hiroyuki c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 6-1, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/08] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11189732.8 | 29.08.2007 | [2012/08] | Priority number, date | JP20060237124 | 01.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006237124 | [2012/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2420950 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2420950 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
G06F21/52 (EP,US);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F21/54 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | G06F21/52, G06F21/54 | ||
Former IPC [2012/08] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/08] | Title | German: | Informationsverarbeitungssystem, Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren, Informationsverarbeitungsprogramm, computerlesbares Medium und Computerdatensignal | [2012/08] | English: | Information processing system, information processing method, information processing program, computer readable medium and computer data signal | [2012/08] | French: | Système de traitement d'informations, procédé de traitement d'informations, programme de traitement d'informations, support lisible sur ordinateur et signal de données informatiques | [2012/08] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 25.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07016935.4 / EP1906330 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070016935) is 01.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2007 | AT | 19.06.2013 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | IT | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | IE | 29.08.2013 | LU | 29.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MT | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
IE | 29.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0140945 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1429224 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; claim 1 *; | [Y]US6874087 (FETKOVICH JOHN EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 3a, 3b, 6 * * column 8, line 58 - line 60 *; | [Y]US2005183072 (HORNING JAMES J [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [1.3.1.3.1] * * paragraph [1.3.1.3.1.6] *; | [A] - Reverse Code Engineering RCE Forums, "Theory behind debugging process request - Armadillo", RCE Forums, (200509), URL: http://www.woodmann.com/forum/archive/index.php/t-9016.html, (20100921), XP002601517 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - SHUB-NIGURRATH [ARTEAM] ET AL, "Cracking with Loaders: Theory, General Approach, and a Framework", CODEBREAKERS MAGAZINE,, (20060101), vol. 1, no. 1, page COMPLETE, XP007914919 [A] 1-15 * paragraph [03.3] * | [A] - BRIAN BLIETZ ET AL, Software Tamper Resistance Through Dynamic Program Monitoring, DIGITAL RIGHTS MANAGEMENT. TECHNOLOGIES, ISSUES, CHALLENGES AND SYSTEM S LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, PAGE(S) 146 - 163, (20060101), ISBN 978-3-540-35998-2, XP019036826 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [02.4] , [ 5.4] , [ 5.5] , [ 5.6] * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11787952_12 | [A] - GEDDON A, "Armadillo 4.20 Removing the armour: a naked animal", (20050101), 20050101, PAGE(S) 1 - 45, URL: http://www.reteam.org/papers/e72.pdf, XP007914958 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * STEP 3; page 14 - page 19 * | by applicant | JPH0333562B | JPH0816385 | US5699512 | JPH11175336 | US6237137 | JP2003337629 | US2004123122 | JP2004185064 | JP2005018725 |