EP2594477 - Rim driven thruster having transverse flux motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gieras, Jacek F 315 Strickland Street Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
Rozman, Gregory I. 6428 Sawgrass Drive Rockford, IL Illinois 61114 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/21] | Application number, filing date | 11189763.3 | 18.11.2011 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594477 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63H1/16 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B63H1/16 (EP);
B63H21/17 (EP);
H02K7/14 (EP);
H02K21/145 (EP);
H02K2201/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Felgenbetriebenes Strahlruder mit Transversalflussmotoren | [2013/21] | English: | Rim driven thruster having transverse flux motor | [2013/21] | French: | Propulseur à entraînement circonférentiel doté d'un moteur à flux transversal | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 16.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1840025 (GORIZIANE SPA [IT]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 1a, 1b, 3a, 3b, 4a, 4b, 5a, 5b * [Y] 2-13,15 [I] 14; | [Y]EP2239194 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 10 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * figures 10, 11 *; | [Y]WO2007084004 (NORPROPELLER AS [NO], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line 11 * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP2330723 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [Y] 12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 26] , [0 32] * * figures 2, 3, 9, 13 *; | [A]EP2159903 (HAMILTON SUNDSTRAND CORP [US]) [A] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0002] *; | [A]US2008211326 (KANG DO HYUN [KR], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0064] * | [Y] - KASTINGER G., "DESIGN OF A NOVEL TRANSVERSE FLUX MACHINE", (20040729), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040729060046/http://www.ansoft.com/news/articles/Design_of_Tranverse_Flux_Machine.pdf, (20120411), XP002673681 [Y] 2-9,13,15 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0002] * | by applicant | US2010052467 |