EP2443926 - Cyclopamine analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinity Discovery, Inc. 780 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Austad, Brian C. 170 Mitchell G. Drive Tewksbury, Massachusetts 01876 / US | 02 /
Behnke, Mark L. 122 North Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 03 /
Castro, Alfredo C. 43 Wildwood Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | 04 /
Charette, Andre B. 1840 Suzor Côté Longueuil, Quebec, Québec J4N 1P6 / CA | 05 /
Grogan, Michael J. 27 Dunster Road Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | 06 /
Janardanannair, Somarajannair 111 Locust Street 78 Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | 07 /
Lescarbeau, Andre 99 Porter St. Somerville, Massachusetts 02143 / US | 08 /
Peluso, Stephane 97 Josephine Avenue Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | 09 /
Tremblay, Martin R. 47 Heywood Avenue Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/17] | 01 /
Austad, Brian C. 170 Mitchell G. Drive Tewksbury, Massachusetts 01876 / US | ||
02 /
Behnke, Mark L. 122 North Street Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | |||
03 /
Castro, Alfredo C. 43 Wildwood Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | |||
04 /
Charette, Andre B. 1840 Suzor Côté Longueuil, Quebec, Québec J4N 1P6 / CA | |||
05 /
Grogan, Michael J. 27 Dunster Road Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | |||
06 /
Janardanannair, Somarajannair 111 Locust Street 78 Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | |||
07 /
Lescarbeau, Andre 33 Mecham Road Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | |||
08 /
Peluso, Stephane 97 Josephine Avenue Somerville, Massachusetts 02144 / US | |||
09 /
Tremblay, Martin R. 47 Heywood Avenue Melrose, Massachusetts 02176 / US | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11189894.6 | 27.12.2007 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20060878018P | 28.12.2006 Original published format: US 878018 P | US20070941596P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 941596 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2443926 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2443926 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/42, A61K31/4355, A61K35/00, A61K35/02, A61K31/58, C07D491/04, C07D491/10, C07J69/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/4355 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/4747 (KR);
A61K31/17 (EP,US);
A61K31/196 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4741 (KR);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/56 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,NO,US);
A61K31/664 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61K38/21 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D307/94 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D471/10 (EP,US);
C07D491/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | AL | 21.11.2011 | BA | 21.11.2011 | HR | 21.11.2011 | MK | 21.11.2011 | RS | 21.11.2011 | Title | German: | Cyclopamin-Analoga | [2012/17] | English: | Cyclopamine analogs | [2012/17] | French: | Analogues de la cyclopamine | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 14.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 09.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07870001.0 / EP2096917 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070870001) is 24.11.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 14.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2014 | 31.12.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2006026430 (INFINITY PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-8 * Example 26; claims 20, 40-42, 47 *; | [X] - MASAMUNE T ET AL, "Syntheses and NMR sprectra of 22,27-imino-17,23-oxidojervane derivatives", TETRAHEDRON,, (19670101), vol. 23, pages 1591 - 1612, XP002609210 [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * whole document, especially p. 1593, Chart II; p. 1596, Chart IV; p. 1599, table 1; p. 1607, last paragraph to p. 1608, l. 12; p. 1611, l. 40 to p. 1612, l. 10 * | [X] - YU, SHICHUN ET AL, "Chemical constituents of the unibract fritillary (Fritillaria unibracteata)", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1990:512481, URL: STN, XP002672111 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - SUGINOME, HIROSHI ET AL, "Photochemical transformations. XXV. Synthesis of O,N-diacetyl-3.beta.-hydroxy-5.alpha.,12.alpha.-jervan-11-one with 17-epi-configuration by hypoiodite reaction", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1974:48238, URL: STN, XP002672112 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - WANG, I. P. ET AL, "Revision of structure of peimisine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1992:490583, URL: STN, XP002672113 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - MASAMUNE, TADASHI ET AL, "C-Nor-D-homosteroids and related alkaloids. IX. Synthesis of jervine and related alkaloids", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1968:3110, URL: STN, XP002672114 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00993a048 | [X] - SUGINOME, HIROSHI ET AL, "Photoinduced transformations. 55. The transformation of jervine into 18-functional D-homo-C-norsteroids. IV. The transformation of jervine into (20R)-18,20.beta.-epoxy-3.beta.-hydroxy-17.beta.-ethyletiojervan-18- one 3-acetate via (20R)-18,20.beta.-epoxy-3.beta.-hydroxy- 12.alpha.,17.beta.-ethyl", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1981:462502, URL: STN, XP002672115 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - ISELIN, B. M. ET AL, "Jervine. IX. Miscellaneous new derivatives", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1956:69487, URL: STN, XP002672116 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01583a042 | [X] - JACOBS, WALTER A. ET AL, "Veratrine alkaloids. XXVII. Further studies with jervine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1948:27548, URL: STN, XP002672117 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - WINTERSTEINER, O. P. ET AL, "Structure of jervine. V. The sulfuric acid-catalyzed acetolysis of diacetyltetrahydrojervine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1955:73588, URL: STN, XP002672118 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - ISELIN, B. M. ET AL, "Structure of jervine. VI. The sulfuric acid-catalyzed acetolysis of N-acetyl-3-deoxy-3.alpha.-chlorotetrahydrojervine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1955:73589, URL: STN, XP002672119 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - WU, JIZHOU ET AL, "Chemical constituent of hubeibeimu (Fritillaria hupehensis Hsiao et K. C. Hsia). V. Isolation and identification of hupehenisine", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1987:15699, URL: STN, XP002672120 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - MASAMUNE, TADASHI ET AL, "C-nor-D-homosteroids and related alkaloids. XV. Stereochemistry of dihydrojervine and related compounds. O.R.D. curves of 11-oxoetiojervanes and 11-oxoiminojervanes", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1969:524714, URL: STN, XP002672121 [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [A] - DI MAGLIANO MARINA PASCA ET AL, "Hedgehog signalling in cancer formation and maintenance", NATURE REVIEWS. CANCER, NATUR PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20031201), vol. 3, no. 12, doi:10.1038/NRC1229, ISSN 1474-175X, pages 903 - 911, XP002591182 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRC1229 | [A] - RUBIN LEE L ET AL, "Targeting the Hedgehog pathway in cancer", NATURE REVIEWS. DRUG DISCOVERY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20061201), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1038/NRD2086, ISSN 1474-1776, pages 1026 - 1033, XP002520119 [A] 1-8 * whole document, especially Table 1a, first three compounds * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRD2086 | [A] - SALDANHA G, "THE HEDGEHOG SIGNALLING PATHWAY AND CANCER", JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD, GB, (20010401), vol. 193, no. 4, doi:10.1002/1096-9896(2000)9999:9999<::AID-PATH815>3.0.CO;2-N, ISSN 0022-3417, pages 427 - 432, XP008015850 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1096-9896(2000)9999:9999<::AID-PATH815>3.0.CO;2-N | by applicant | WO2005013800 | WO2006026430 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.2600660104, pages 1 - 19, XP002675560 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600660104 | - MASALOV ET AL., ORGANIC LETTERS, (2004), vol. 6, pages 2365 - 8 | - HANSEN ET AL., CHEM. COMM., (2006), pages 4838 - 40 | - XIE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 90 - 2 | - REIFENBERGER, CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, pages 1798 - 803 | - BERMAN ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 846 - 51 | - THAYER ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 851 - 56 | - WATKINS ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 422, pages 313 - 317 | - KARHADKAR ET AL., NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 707 - 12 | - SHENG ET AL., MOLECULAR CANCER, (2004), vol. 3, pages 29 - 42 | - FAN ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, pages 3961 - 70 | - KUBO ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 6071 - 74 | - LEWIS ET AL., JOURNAL OF MAMMARY GLAND BIOLOGY AND NEOPLASIA, (2004), vol. 2, pages 165 - 181 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, pages 4616 - 21 | - BERMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 297, pages 1559 - 61 | - WATKINS ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 422, pages 313 - 7 | - KUBO ET AL., CANCER RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 64, pages 6071 - 4 | - BALE; YU, HUMAN MOLEC. GENET., (2001), vol. 10, pages 757 - 762 | - XIE ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 90 - 92 | - PIETSCH ET AL., CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 57, pages 2085 - 88 | - NAKAMURA ET AL., BBRC, (1997), vol. 237, page 465 | - VAN DER HORST ET AL., BONE, (2003), vol. 33, page 899 |