EP2428638 - Low-clearance centralizer and method of making centralizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frank's International, Inc. 10260 Westheimer Road, Suite 700 Houston, TX 77042 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Frank's International, Inc. 10260 Westheimer Road Suite 700 Houston, TX 77042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buytaert, Jean P. 7541 FM 1195 Mineral Wells, TX Texas 76067 / US | 02 /
Miller, Eugene Edward 103 Oak Ridge Terrace Weatherford, TX Texas 76086 / US | 03 /
Young, Jimmy Mack PO Box 790 Weatherford, TX Texas 76088 / US | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Dowling, Andrew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2012/11] | Application number, filing date | 11190466.0 | 08.05.2008 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | US20070749544 | 16.05.2007 Original published format: US 749544 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2428638 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2428638 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/10 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
E21B17/1028 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49609 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49863 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49906 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/11] | Title | German: | Zentriereinrichtung mit geringem Spiel und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Zentriereinrichtung | [2012/11] | English: | Low-clearance centralizer and method of making centralizer | [2012/11] | French: | Centreur à faible tolérance et son procédé de fabrication | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08755188.3 / EP2158378 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2012 | 31.05.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009496 (JOHNSON LEONARD W) [A] 1-12 * page 1, column l, lines 24-31; figures 4,19 *; | [Y]US3200884 (SOLUM JAMES R, et al) [Y] 4-12 * figures 4,7 *; | [A]WO9964714 (SAGA TRADE U K LIMITED [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]US2004173349 (POINTING MICHAEL EDWARD [NL]) [X] 1,3 * figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US2005183864 (TRINDER DUNCAN J [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0007] , [0062]; figure 3 * [Y] 4-12 | by applicant | US6679325 | US20060427251 |