EP2422774 - Pharmaceutical composition containing a tetrahydrofolic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked by proprietor Status updated on 19.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2015/33] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Christina Schönhauser Allee 73 F D-10437 Berlin / DE | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/09] | 01 /
King, Christina Dunckerstrasse 26 10437 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2012/39] | Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/09] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 11190550.1 | 29.06.2007 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | EP20060014002 | 06.07.2006 Original published format: EP 06014002 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422774 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2422774 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K31/585, A61K31/567, A61K31/525, A61P15/18 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
A61K9/2054 (EP);
A61K31/525 (KR,RU);
A61K31/57 (KR);
A61K31/585 (KR,RU);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
A61P5/34 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | 24.11.2011 | BA | 24.11.2011 | HR | 24.11.2011 | MK | 24.11.2011 | RS | 24.11.2011 | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung enthaltend eine Tetrahydrofolsäure | [2012/09] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition containing a tetrahydrofolic acid | [2012/09] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique contenant un acide tetrahydrofolique | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 29.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07764936.6 / EP2040683 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070764936) is 17.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
12.10.2016
INADMISSIBLE Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A. Gran Via Carlos III, 98, 7th floor 08028 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Schön, Christoph, et al, et al Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2016/52] |
Former [2016/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.2016
INADMISSIBLE Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A. Gran Via Carlos III, 98, 7th floor 08028 Barcelona / ES Opponent's representative Schön, Christoph, et al, et al Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | 10.08.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: opposition inadmissible 01 | 12.08.2016 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.08.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular right | 07.10.2016 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | Revocation procedure | 08.04.2016 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | ADMISSIBLE | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that patent will be revoked | 15.06.2016 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | 08.04.2016 | Fee for revocation paid |
Former [2016/24] | 08.04.2016 | Request for revocation under Article 105a | |
ADMISSIBLE | |||
15.06.2016 | Date of legal effect of revocation of patent | ||
08.04.2016 | Fee for revocation paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | IT | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2017/07] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
IT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5916593 (DE HAAN PIETER [NL], et al) [Y] 13,14 * column 1, lines 4-8 * * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 5 * * column 4 - column 6; examples I,IV,VII,VIII,XI *; | [A]WO9953910 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6, lines 3-19 * * page 16, lines 1-8 * * page 17, lines 9-18 * * page 17, line 31 - page 18, line 8 ** page 28; example 13 *; | [Y]WO0115701 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [Y] 13,14 * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 2, lines 25-31 * * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 16 * * page 11 - page 12; examples 1-3 * * claims 1-45 *; | [IDY]WO03070255 (PANTARHEI BIOSCIENCE BV [NL], et al) [ID] 1-15 * page 4, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 3 * * page 13; examples 1,2 * * claims 1-17 * [Y] 13,14; | [Y]EP1632237 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [Y] 13,14 * page 2, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 20 * * page 4, paragraph 31 * * page 6, paragraph 43 - page 7, paragraph 56 * * page 8, paragraph 70 - page 9, paragraph 72 * * page 11; table 1.2 * * page 12 - page 14; examples 3-5 * * claims 1-19 * | by applicant | US4621079 | US5798338 | US6011040 | US6190693 | US6441168 | EP1253607 | US6610670 | WO03070255 | EP1353700 | - MMWR, MORB. MORTAL. WKLY. REP., (1992), vol. 41, no. RR-14, pages 1 - 7 | - "Bioequivalence assessment of three different estradiol formulations in postmenopausal women in an open, randomised, single-dose, 3-way cross-over", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF DRUG METABOLISM AND PHARMACOKINETICS, (1999), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 47 - 53 | - "Probleme der Dosisfindung: Sexualhormone", PROBLEMS OF DOSE-FINDING: SEX HORMONES | - F. NEUMANN ET AL., "Arzneimittelforschung", PHARMACEUTICAL AGENT RESEARCH, (1977), vol. 27, 2A, pages 296 - 318 | - "Aktuelle Entwicklungen in der hormonalen Kontrazeption", CURRENT DEVELOPMENTS IN HORMONAL CONTRACEPTION | - H. KUHL, "Gynakotoge", GYNECOLOGIST, (1992), vol. 25, pages 231 - 240 | Opposition | WO9609056 | EP1044975 | WO0115701 | WO0152857 | WO03070255 | WO2006120035 | WO2008003432 | - "Opinion of the Scientific Panel on Food Additives, Flavourings, Processing Aids and Materials in Contact with Food on a request from the Commission related to Calcium L-Methylfolate;", EFSA Journal 2004, (20041123), vol. 135, pages 1 - 20, XP055180628 | - Ansel's Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms and Drug Delivery Systems, (19990000), pages 209 - 213, XP055293485 | - Handbook of Pharmaceutical Excipients, (20060000), pages 132 - 135 |