Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8916795 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2014 | B2 | US2012248072 | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113073549 | 28.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2505782 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2014 | B1 | EP2505782 | 03.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113073549 | 28.03.2011 |