EP2458231 - Multi-stage engagement assemblies and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bal Seal Engineering, Inc. 19650 Pauling Foothill Ranch, CA 92610-2610 / US | [2017/24] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Bal Seal Engineering, Inc. 19650 Pauling Foothill Ranch CA 92610-2610 / US | ||
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Bal Seal Engineering Co. 19650 Pauling Foothill Ranch, CA 92610-2610 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Changsivong, Derek 19650 Pauling Foothill Ranch, CA California 92610-2610 / US | 02 /
Cook, Hugh 6 Eldorado Foothill Ranch, CA California 92610 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/22] | Gevers France 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11190981.8 | 28.11.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | US201113304004 | 23.11.2011 Original published format: US201113304004 | US20100418331P | 30.11.2010 Original published format: US 418331 P | US20110430912P | 07.01.2011 Original published format: US 430912 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2012/22] | US20110304004 | 23.11.2011 | |
US20100418331P | 30.11.2010 | ||
US20110430912P | 07.01.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458231 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458231 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/16, F16B21/18, F16B21/20 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
A61F2/78 (EP,US);
F16B7/0406 (US);
F16B21/18 (EP,US);
F16B21/183 (EP,US);
F16B21/186 (EP,US);
F16B21/205 (EP,US);
A61F2002/7887 (EP,US);
F16B2200/69 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49613 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T403/553 (EP,US);
Y10T403/602 (EP,US);
Y10T403/604 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Mehrstufige Eingriffsanordnungen und zugehörige Verfahren | [2012/22] | English: | Multi-stage engagement assemblies and related methods | [2012/22] | French: | Ensembles d'engagement multi-niveaux et procédés correspondants | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16168713.2 / EP3078865 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2011 | AL | 14.06.2017 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 28.11.2017 | LU | 28.11.2017 | MT | 28.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.11.2011 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 28.11.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
MT | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2390618 (LAMOURIC POL [FR]) [X] 7-13* page 4, lines 9-25 *; | [X]WO2008100319 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0069] - [0078] *; | [X]US2009149053 (CHANGSRIVONG DEREK [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0057] - [0062] * | Examination | US2009160139 | by applicant | US4678210 | US5082390 | US5411348 | US5545842 | US6749358 | US6835084 | US7070455 | US7195523 | US2010028076 |