EP2444601 - Roller bearing, camshaft supporting structure, and internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2015/39] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Katsufumi NTN Corporation 1578, Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 02 /
Tsuchiyama, Hiroki NTN Corporation NOF Utsunomiya Bldg. 6F, 1-1 Babadori 2-chome Utsunomiya-shi, Tochigi 320-0026 / JP | 03 /
Oishi, Shinji NTN Corporation 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi, Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | 04 /
Fujii, Noriaki Honda R & D Co. Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-Shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Fujimoto, Tomoya Honda R & D Co. Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-Shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Yoshida, Keiko Honda R & D Co. Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-Shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 07 /
Abe, Kazuto Honda R & D Co. Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 08 /
Komura, Kiminori Honda R & D Co. Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Bockhorni & Kollegen Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11191492.5 | 30.08.2007 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | JP20060238430 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006238430 | JP20060238431 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006238431 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444601 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444601 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/04, F02F1/24, F16C19/26, F16C19/44, F16C33/58, F16C33/60 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
F01L1/0532 (EP,US);
F16C19/466 (EP,US);
F16C33/60 (EP,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,US);
F01L1/024 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0476 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0537 (EP,US);
F01L2301/00 (EP,US);
F16C2360/18 (EP,US);
Y10S384/906 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2012/17] | Title | German: | Rollenlager, Nockenwellenträgerstruktur und Verbrennungsmotor | [2012/17] | English: | Roller bearing, camshaft supporting structure, and internal combustion engine | [2012/17] | French: | Roulement à rouleaux, structure de support d'arbre à cames, et moteur à combustion interne | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 15.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07806420.1 / EP2060753 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2006125606 (NSK LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XD]JP2005180459 (NSK LTD) [XD] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XP]JP2006336765 (JTEKT CORP) [XP] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2005180459 |