EP2599841 - White inkjet inks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Agfa Graphics N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | ||
For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smet, Stefaan AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
André, Xavier AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3622 Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2013/23] | Application number, filing date | 11191663.1 | 02.12.2011 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599841 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/10 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B41J2/175 (US);
B65B3/06 (US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP,US);
C09D11/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Weiße Tintenstrahltinten | [2013/23] | English: | White inkjet inks | [2013/23] | French: | Encres blanche pour jet d'encre | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004256726 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0008]; example -; claim - *; | [ID]WO2008067202 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [ID] 1-15 * paragraph [0024]; example - *; | [A]EP2161264 (AGFA GRAPHICS NV [BE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0078] *; | [A]US2009000508 (EDISON SARA [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2005146544 (KONDO AI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example - * | by applicant | US4880465 | EP1388578 | US2007259986 | US7850774 | US2010105807 | EP1911814 | EP1857510 | US6310115 | EP2065362 | EP2161264 | EP2053101 | US2006014848 | US6289654 | - J. V. CRIVELLO, ADVANCES IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 62, pages 1 - 47 | - CRIVELLO, J.V. ET AL., Photoinitiators for Free Radical Cationic, JOHN WILEY AND SONS LTD, (1998), vol. III, pages 287 - 294 |