EP2460832 - TWEAK binding antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen Idec MA Inc. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkly, Linda C. 34 Winthrop Street West Newton, MA 02465 / US | 02 /
Garber, Ellen 14 Donnell Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 03 /
Lugovskoy, Alexey 24 Center Street Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Miller, David James Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Miller, David James Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11191813.2 | 25.05.2006 | [2012/23] | Priority number, date | US20050685149P | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 685149 P | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2460832 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2460832 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61P35/00, A61K39/395 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12P21/00 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | TWEAK-bindende Antikörper | [2012/23] | English: | TWEAK binding antibodies | [2012/23] | French: | Anticorps se liant à TWEAK | [2012/23] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 13.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06760258.1 / EP1888113 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060760258) is 08.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005008636 (RENNERT PAUL [US]) [X] 1-16* the whole document *; | [I] - POTROVITA I ET AL, "TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR-LIKE WEAK INDUCER OF APOPTOSIS-INDUCED NEURODEGENERATION", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20040922), vol. 24, no. 38, doi:10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1089-04.2004, ISSN 0270-6474, pages 8237 - 8244, XP009045900 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 8239, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1523/JNEUROSCI.1089-04.2004 | [I] - POTROVITA I ET AL, "TWEAK - A REGULATOR OF NEURONAL CELL DEATH", NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCHIVES OF PHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20040309), vol. 369, no. SUPPL. 01, ISSN 0028-1298, page R12, XP009045913 [I] 1-16 * the whole document * | [I] - CHICHEPORTICHE YVES ET AL, "Proinflammatory activity of TWEAK on human dermal fibroblasts and synoviocytes: blocking and enhancing effects of anti-TWEAK monoclonal antibodies", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH, CURRENT SCIENCE, LONDON, GB, (20011109), vol. 4, no. 2, doi:10.1186/ar388, ISSN 1465-9905, pages 126 - 133, XP021020655 [I] 1-16 * abstract * * page 126, column l, paragraph 1 - page 127, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 133, column l, paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar388 | [I] - JAKUBOWSKI A ET AL, "Dual role for TWEAK in angiogenic regulation", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20020101), vol. 115, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 267 - 274, XP002974742 [I] 1-16 * page 268, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * | [I] - NAKAYAMA M ET AL, "Characterization of murine TWEAK and its receptor (Fn14) by monoclonal antibodies", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20030711), vol. 306, no. 4, doi:10.1016/s0006-291x(03)01051-9, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 819 - 825, XP004432093 [I] 1-16 * page 820, column r, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)01051-9 | by applicant | US4399216 | DE3218121 | US4439196 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475196 | US4485045 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4544545 | US4596556 | US4634665 | WO8705330 | US4790824 | WO9002809 | US4941880 | WO9007861 | US5064413 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | EP0502814 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | US5179017 | WO9301288 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5312335 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5530101 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5585089 | US5624821 | US5641640 | US5648260 | US5658727 | US5667988 | US5693761 | US5693762 | WO9852976 | US5849992 | US5859205 | US5869046 | US5885793 | WO0034317 | US6300064 | US6407213 | US2003070185 | US2003211993 | US2005008625 | US2005037000 | US2005079574 | - SALEH ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (1990), vol. 32, pages 180 - 190 | - LOBUGLIO ET AL., HYBRIDOMA, (1986), vol. 5, pages 5117 - 5123 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, page 4628 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1989), pages 6.3.1 - 6.3.6 | - SMITH, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317 | - GREEN ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21 | - MORRISON, S. L., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207 | - OI ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - TOMLINSON, I.A. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - COOK, G. P. ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1995), vol. 16, pages 237 - 242 | - CHOTHIA, D. ET AL., J. MOL. BIO., (1992), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., EMBO J, (1995), vol. 14, pages 4628 - 4638 | - TOMLINSON, I.A. ET AL., MRC CENTRE FOR PROTEIN ENGINEERING | - TEMPEST ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 266 - 271 | - ANGAL ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 30, pages 105 - 08 | - APLIN; WRISTON, CRC CRIT. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 22, pages 259 - 306 | - HAKIMUDDIN ET AL., ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1987), vol. 259, page 52 | - EDGE ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 118, page 131 | - THOTAKURA ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 138, page 350 | - LUND ET AL., J. IMMUN., (1991), vol. 147, pages 2657 - 62 | - MORGAN ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 86, pages 319 - 24 | - DAVIES ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (1996), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 531 - 7 | - POWERS ET AL., JLMMUNOL METHODS., (2001), vol. 251, pages 123 - 35 | - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - KAUFMAN; SHARP, MOL. BFOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621 | - BURTON; WOOF, ADV IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 51, pages 1 - 84 | - JEFFERIS ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (1998), vol. 163, pages 59 - 76 | - CHICHEPORTICHE ET AL., ARTHRITIS RES., (2002), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 126 - 133 | - SJOLANDER; URBANICZKY, ANAL CHEM., (1991), vol. 63, pages 2338 - 2345 | - SZABO ET AL., CURR. OPIN. STRUCT. BIOI., (1995), vol. 5, pages 699 - 705 | - JOHNE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1993), vol. 160, pages 191 - 198 | - STUART ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1982), vol. 69, pages 673 - 683 | - POSER ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1983), vol. 13, page 227 | - KURTZKE, NEUROLOGY, (1983), vol. 33, page 1444 | - KURTZKE, ANN. NEUROL., (1994), vol. 36, pages 573 - 79 | - TUOHY ET AL., J. IMMULWL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 1126 - 1130 | - SOBEL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 132, pages 2393 - 2401 | - TRAUGOTT, CELL IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 119, pages 114 - 129 | - BERGE, S.M. ET AL., J. PHARNI. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - ROUX ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9079 - 9083 | - CURR GENE THER., (2005), vol. 5, pages 63 - 70 | - HUM GENE THER., (2004), vol. 15, pages 1034 - 1044 | - DUZGUNES ET AL., J. CELL. BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 16, page E 77 | - EPSTEIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, pages 3688 - 92 | - HWANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4030 - 34 | - COLCHER ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 802 - 816 | - "Developments in Antibody Imaging", A.R. BRADWELL ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies for Cancer Detection and Therapy, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1985), pages 65 - 85 | - PYKETT, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, (1982), vol. 246, pages 78 - 88 | US20050653811 | US20050653813 | US20050679518 | US20050685465 |