EP2545921 - Acid addition salts, hydrates and polymorphs of 5-(2,4-dihydroxy-5-isopropyl-phenyl)-4-(4-morpholin-4-ylmethyl-phenyl)-isoxazole-3-carboxylic acid ethylamide and formulations comprising these forms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For all designated states Vernalis (R&D) Ltd. Oakdene Court 613 Reading Road Winnersh Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drysdale, Martin James Vernalis (R & D) Ltd. Oakdene Court 613 Reading Road Winnersh, Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | 02 /
Dymock, Brian William S*BIO Pte Ltd. 1 Science Park Road 05-09 The Capricorn Singapore Science Park II 117528 Singapore / SG | 03 /
Krell, Christoph Breisacherstrasse 71/2 4057 Basel / CH | 04 /
Mutz, Michael Mozartstrasse 33 79104 Freiburg / DE | 05 /
Petersen, Holger Akazienweg 1 79591 Eimeldingen / DE | 06 /
Zheng, Weijia Novartis Institutes for BioMedical 250 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Lardans, Vinca Raymonde Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2013/03] | Application number, filing date | 11192158.1 | 28.02.2008 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | EP20070103346 | 01.03.2007 Original published format: EP 07103346 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2545921 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2545921 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5377, A61P35/00, C07D261/18 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/10 (KR);
C07D295/155 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D261/18 (EP,US);
C07D295/00 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Säureadditionssalze, Hydrate und Polymorphe eines 5-(2,4-dihydroxy-5-isopropyl-phenyl)-4-(4-morpholin-4-ylmethyl-phenyl)-isoxazol-3-carboxylischen Säure-Ethylamids und Formulierungen mit diesen Formen | [2013/03] | English: | Acid addition salts, hydrates and polymorphs of 5-(2,4-dihydroxy-5-isopropyl-phenyl)-4-(4-morpholin-4-ylmethyl-phenyl)-isoxazole-3-carboxylic acid ethylamide and formulations comprising these forms | [2013/03] | French: | Sels d'addition acide, hydrates et polymorphes d'éthylamide de l'acide 5-(2,4-dihydroxy-5-isopropyl-phényl)-4-(4-morpholin-4-ylméthyl-phényl)-isoxazole-3-carboxylique et des formulations comprenant ces formes | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/14] | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08717228.4 / EP2131845 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2004072051 (VERNALIS CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB], et al) [YD] 1-14 * example 78 *; | [Y] - MORISSETTE SHERRY L ET AL, "HIGH-THROUGHPUT CRYSTALLIZATION: POLYMORPHS, SALTS, CO-CRYSTALS AND SOLCATES OF PHARMACEUTICAL SOLIDS", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (2004), vol. 56, no. 3, ISSN 0169-409X, pages 275 - 300, XP009072233 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 276 * * pages 285-286 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2003.10.020 | [Y] - CAIRA M R, "CRYSTALLINE POLYMORPHISM OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (1998), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP001156954 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * pages 164-166 * * pages 177-179 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5 | [Y] - TONG W-Q ET AL, "IN SITU SALT SCREENING-A USEFUL TECHNIQUE FOR DISCOVERY SUPPORT AND PREFORMULATION STUDIES", PHARMACEUTICAL DEVELOPMENT AND TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199805), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1083-7450, pages 215 - 223, XP001203865 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 216 * * pages 221-222; table 1 * | [Y] - GOULD P L, "SALT SELECTION FOR BASIC DRUGS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1986), vol. 33, no. 1/3, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 201 - 217, XP002074725 [Y] 1-14 * figure 5; tables 1,3 * * pages 212-213 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-5173(86)90055-4 | by applicant | WO2004072051 |