EP2469066 - Manifold for distributing gas in the intake ducts of a heat engine of an automobile and intake module provided with such a manifold [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | [2017/04] |
Former [2012/26] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourgoin, Guillaume 38, rue du Docteur Désourteaux 87000 Limoges / FR | 02 /
Martins, Carlos 36, rue Jean Duplessis 78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [2012/26] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2012/26] | Metz, Gaëlle Valeo Systemes Thermiques BG THS - Service Propriété Industrielle 8, rue Louis Lormand B.P. 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Application number, filing date | 11192195.3 | 06.12.2011 | [2012/26] | Priority number, date | FR20100060933 | 21.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1060933 | [2012/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2469066 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2469066 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/14, F02M35/10, F02M35/104, F02B29/04, F02M26/17 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
F02M35/10222 (EP);
F02B29/0437 (EP);
F02B29/0462 (EP);
F02M26/17 (EP);
F02M35/104 (EP);
F02M26/05 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/26] | F02M35/08, F02M25/07, F02M35/10, F02B29/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] |
Former [2012/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kollektor zur Gasverteilung in die Zuführleitungen einer Wärmekraftmaschine eines Kraftfahrzeugs, und mit einem solchen Kollektor ausgestattetes Zuführmodul | [2012/26] | English: | Manifold for distributing gas in the intake ducts of a heat engine of an automobile and intake module provided with such a manifold | [2012/26] | French: | Collecteur de répartition de gaz dans des conduits d'admission d'un moteur thermique | [2012/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 19.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2011 | AL | 25.01.2017 | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | DK | 25.01.2017 | EE | 25.01.2017 | FI | 25.01.2017 | HR | 25.01.2017 | IT | 25.01.2017 | LT | 25.01.2017 | LV | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | MT | 25.01.2017 | NL | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | RS | 25.01.2017 | SE | 25.01.2017 | SI | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | NO | 25.04.2017 | GR | 26.04.2017 | IS | 25.05.2017 | PT | 25.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.12.2011 | |
AT | 25.01.2017 | ||
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
MT | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SI | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
DK | 25.01.2017 | ||
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
EE | 25.01.2017 | ||
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
IT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
FI | 25.01.2017 | ||
HR | 25.01.2017 | ||
LT | 25.01.2017 | ||
LV | 25.01.2017 | ||
NL | 25.01.2017 | ||
RS | 25.01.2017 | ||
SE | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
NO | 25.04.2017 | ||
GR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IS | 25.05.2017 | ||
PT | 25.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2098716 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * figure 4 *; | [X]JP2000192858 (AISAN IND, et al) [X] 1-8,11-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0008]; figures 5,8 *; | [X]US2009293831 (HARADA KENICHI [JP]) [X] 1-7,11-15 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0064]; figure 7 *; | [X]JP2005256679 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [X] 1,3,11-15 * abstract *; | [A]FR2946698 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]) [A] 9,10 * figure 4 * | Examination | EP2278138 | EP2161429 | DE4235075 |