blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2481753

EP2481753 - Anti-IL-17 Antibodies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
[2012/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Allan, Barrett
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
02 / Chow, Chi-kin
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
03 / Huang, Lihua
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
04 / Liu, Ling
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
05 / Lu, Jirong
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
06 / Ng, Kingman
10745 Putnam Place
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
07 / Tetreault, Jonathan Wendell
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
08 / Werner, Andrew Gordon
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
 [2012/31]
Representative(s)Kent, Lindsey Ruth
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/31]Kent, Lindsey Ruth
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
Lilly Research Center
European Patent Operations
Sunninghill Road, Earl Wood Manor, Windlesham
Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Application number, filing date11192240.705.12.2006
[2012/31]
Priority number, dateUS20050749953P13.12.2005         Original published format: US 749953 P
US20060801948P19.05.2006         Original published format: US 801948 P
[2012/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2481753
Date:01.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2481753
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2012
ClassificationIPC:C07K16/24, A61K39/395
[2012/31]
CPC:
C07K16/244 (EP,NO,US); C07K16/24 (KR); A61K39/395 (KR);
A61P11/00 (EP); A61P11/06 (EP); A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP); A61P19/08 (EP); A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/00 (KR); A61K2039/505 (EP,US); C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US); C07K2317/92 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/16]
Former [2012/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL01.02.2013
BA01.02.2013
HR01.02.2013
MK01.02.2013
RS01.02.2013
TitleGerman:Antikörper gegen IL-17[2012/31]
English:Anti-IL-17 Antibodies[2012/31]
French:Anticorps anti-IL-17[2012/31]
Examination procedure30.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2013Examination requested  [2013/11]
14.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2018Fee for grant paid
08.03.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.03.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06846464.3  / EP1963368
Divisional application(s)EP18160779.7  / EP3366702
EP20190492.7  / EP3808769
Opposition(s)21.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 03
10.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
10.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
05.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
04.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
02.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
02.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[IY]WO2004106377  (CELLTECH R&D LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 30 * [Y] 12-15;
 [AP]WO2006013107  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 38 * * page 41 *;
 [AP]WO2006054059  (UCB CELLTECH [GB], et al) [AP] 1-15 * page 32 - page 33 * * page 26 *;
 [Y]  - HOFSTETTER ET AL, "Therapeutic efficacy of IL-17 neutralization in murine experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (200510), vol. 237, no. 2, ISSN 0008-8749, pages 123 - 130, XP005253007 [Y] 12-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cellimm.2005.11.002
 [A]  - GIAVEDONI L D, "Simultaneous detection of multiple cytokines and chemokines from nonhuman primates using luminex technology", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (200506), vol. 301, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 89 - 101, XP004976653 [A] 1 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2005.03.015
 [A]  - MOSELEY T A ET AL, "Interleukin-17 family and IL-17 receptors", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, OXFORD, GB, (200304), vol. 14, no. 2, ISSN 1359-6101, pages 155 - 174, XP002321611 [A] 1-15 * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6101(03)00002-9
 [A]  - LUBBERTS E, "THE ROLE OF IL-17 AND FAMILY MEMBERS IN THE PATHOGENESIS OF ARTHRITIS", CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, PHARMAPRESS, US, (200305), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1472-4472, pages 572 - 577, XP009056201 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantWO8601533
 US4816567
 US4816397
 EP0125023
 US5225539
 EP0120694
 EP0194276
 WO9404679
 EP0239400
 US5545806
 US5545807
 US5569825
 US5585089
 US5589369
 US5591669
 US5612205
 US5625126
 US5625825
 US5633425
 US5661016
 US5693761
 US5698762
 US5721367
 EP0843961
 US5770429
 US5789650
 US5789215
 US5807715
 US5814318
 US6284471
 WO2005005604
    - YAO, Z. ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1995), vol. 3, page 811
    - KOLLS; LINDEN, IMMUNITY, (2004), vol. 21, pages 467 - 476
    - FOSSIEZ ET AL., INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 16, page 541
    - WITKOWSKI ET AL., CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2004), vol. 61, pages 567 - 579
    - LUBBERTS ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (2004), vol. 50, pages 650 - 659
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - KABAT ET AL., ANN. AT ACAD. SCI., (1971), vol. 190, pages 382 - 93
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 2551 - 2555
    - JAKOBOVITS ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258
    - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology ofallonoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - MATTHEWS DJ; WELLS JA., SCIENCE., (1993), vol. 260, pages 1113 - 7
    - HANES ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. (USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 14130 - 5
    - SAMUELSON P. ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOTECHNOLOGY., (2002), vol. 96, pages 129 - 54
    - KIEKE M.C. ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1997), vol. 10, pages 1303 - 10
    - LITTLE M. ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 364 - 70
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 6
    - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83
    - MCCAFFERTY ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 348, pages 552 - 4
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 20
    - KAUFMAN; SHARP, J MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 21
    - TAYLOR ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 95
    - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 329
    - PRESTA, CURR. OP. STRUCT. BIOL., (1992), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596
    - KETTLEBOROUGH, C.A. ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1991), vol. 4, pages 773 - 783
    - QUEEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, page 2869
    - LEVITT, M., V., MOL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 168, pages 595 - 620
    - RIECHMANN ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327
    - VERHOEYEN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536
    - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 227, page 381
    - MARKS ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, page 581
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77
    - BOERNER ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, pages 86 - 95
    - MARKS ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783
    - LONBERG ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 856 - 859
    - MORRISON, NATURE, (1994), vol. 368, pages 812 - 13
    - FISHWILD ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51
    - NEUBERGER, NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, page 826
    - LONBERG; HUSZAR, INTERN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93
    - JOBKOBOVITS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, page 2551
    - BRUGGEMANN ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 6709 - 6713
    - MENDEZ ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156
    - GREEN; JAKOBOVITS, J EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 188, pages 483 - 495
    - HUNTER ET AL., NATURE, (1962), vol. 144, page 945
    - DAVID ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 13, page 1014
    - PAIN ET AL., J IMMUNOL. METH., (1981), vol. 40, page 219
    - NYGREN, J., HISTOCHEM. AND CYTOCHEM., (1982), vol. 30, page 407
    - ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (2000), vol. 59, pages 529 - 32
    - J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 1004 - 1013
    - J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, pages 6173 - 6177
    - MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS, (1999), vol. 5, pages 101 - 104
    - J IMM., (1995), vol. 155, pages 5483 - 5486
    - CYTOKINE, (1997), vol. 9, pages 794 - 800
    - HOOFNAGLE, A. ET AL., METHODS MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 250, pages 283 - 298
    - HOOFNAGLE, A. ET AL., ANN. REV. BIOPHYS. BIOMOL. STRUCT., (2003), vol. 32, pages 1 - 25
    - BAERGA-ORTIZ, A. ET AL., PROTEIN SCI., (2002), vol. 11, pages 1300 - 8
    - E. BLASI ET AL., J IMMUNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 27, pages 229 - 237
    - FASEB JOURNAL., (2004), vol. 18, pages 1550 - 1552
    - LOCK ET AL., NAT. MED., (2002), vol. 8, pages 500 - 508
    - MATUSEVICIUS ET AL., MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS., (1999), vol. 5, pages 1 - 1,104
    - NAKAE ET AL., J IMMUN., vol. 171, pages 6173 - 6177
    - I EXP. MED., (2001), vol. 194, pages 873 - 881
    - TRENTHAM, D ET AL., J EXP. MED., (1977), vol. 146, pages 857 - 858
    - BLIVEN, M. ET AL., ARTHRITIS & RHEUMATISM, (1986), vol. 29, pages 1131 - 1138
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.