Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
19.04.2013 | Change - representative | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
21.01.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.11.2012 | Change - representative | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
06.07.2012 | Change - priority | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] |
12.06.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |