EP2463215 - Gusseted flexible package with enlarged opening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fres-co System USA, Inc. 3005 State Road Telford, PA 18969-1033 / US | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Barbara Ann 3058 Sterner Mill Road Quakertown, PA Pennsylvania 18951 / US | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Clarke, Geoffrey Howard, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/52] | Roberts, Scott Anthony, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Moore, Christopher Mark Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11192911.3 | 09.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | US20100421907P | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 421907 P | US201113313126 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: US201113313126 | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/24] | US201042190710P | 10.12.2010 | |
US201113313126 | 07.12.2011 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2463215 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/12, B65D30/20 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
B65D31/10 (EP,US);
B65D31/14 (EP,US);
B65D77/12 (EP,US);
B65D2205/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flexible Seitenfaltenverpackung mit vergrösserter Öffnung | [2012/24] | English: | Gusseted flexible package with enlarged opening | [2012/24] | French: | Paquet souple à soufflets doté d'une ouverture agrandie | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2234065 (VOGT CLARENCE W) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3-8; | [XI]JPS53114507U (.) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 * [I] 2; | [YD]US6234676 (GALOMB DAVID E [US], et al) [YD] 3-8* the whole document *; | [XI]US6367976 (BANNISTER ROGER [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 32 * * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 59; figures 1,6,7 * [I] 2 | by applicant | US4518087 | US4576285 | US4705174 | US4913561 | US5692837 | US6082897 | US6234676 |