EP2471367 - Low temperature stable concentrates of isothiazolinones in plasticizers selected from benzoate esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Company 100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamel, Roger, G. 22 Kanon Court Newtown, PA 18940 / US | 02 /
Levy, Richard 585 Chemin de Villbruc 06560 Valbonne / FR | 03 /
Koehler, Thomas Langhaldenstrasse 3 8280 Kreuzlingen TG / CH | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Hoggins, Mark Andrew, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11193023.6 | 12.12.2011 | [2012/27] | Priority number, date | EP20100290680 | 29.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10290680 | [2012/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471367 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2471367 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, A01N25/02, C08K5/10, C08K5/46, A01P1/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
A01N43/80 (EP,US);
C08K5/10 (EP,US);
C08K5/46 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP,US);
A01N43/80, A01N25/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/24] | A01N43/80, A01N25/02, A01N25/30, C08K5/10, C08K5/46, A01P1/00 | ||
Former IPC [2012/27] | A01N43/80, A01N25/02, A01P1/00, C08K5/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | Bei niedriger Temperatur stabile Isothiazolinone-Konzentrate in Weichmachern ausgewählt aus Benzoat-Estrern | [2012/27] | English: | Low temperature stable concentrates of isothiazolinones in plasticizers selected from benzoate esters | [2012/27] | French: | Concentrés d'isothiazolinone stables à basse température dans des plastifiants sélectionnés parmi les esters de benzoate | [2012/27] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.11.2014
ADMISSIBLE Thor GmbH Landwehrstrasse 1 67346 Speyer / DE | [2014/51] | 13.01.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.05.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/15] | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2011 | AL | 05.03.2014 | AT | 05.03.2014 | BE | 05.03.2014 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | DK | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | ES | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | HR | 05.03.2014 | IT | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | MT | 05.03.2014 | NL | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | RS | 05.03.2014 | SE | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | SM | 05.03.2014 | TR | 05.03.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | NO | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | IE | 12.12.2014 | LU | 12.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 12.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
MT | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 12.12.2011 | |
AT | 05.03.2014 | ||
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
TR | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
SM | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
IE | 12.12.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
LU | 12.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
DK | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
ES | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
NL | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
BE | 05.03.2014 | ||
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
HR | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RS | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 05.03.2014 | |
CY | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
SE | 05.03.2014 | ||
NO | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | |
NO | 05.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5498344 (REI NUNO M [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [A]US5554635 (REI NUNO M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0910953 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [AD] 1-10 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US5554635 | EP0910953 |