EP2432190 - Improved media delivery platform [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKKY, LLC 888 Colwell Building 123 North Third Street Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | For all designated states Mikkelsen, John P. SKKY, LLC 888 Colwell Building 123 North Third Street Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | For all designated states Freidson, Robert I. 25 Kamennoostrovsky Ave., Apt. 61 Sint Petersburg 197101 / RU | [2016/46] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states SKKY Incorporated 123 North Third Street Suite 888 Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | ||
For all designated states Mikkelsen, John P. SKKY Incorporated 17715 Breconwood Road Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | |||
For all designated states Freidson, Robert I. 25 Kamennoostrovsky Ave., Apt. 61 Sint Petersburg 197101 / RU | |||
Former [2012/12] | For all designated states SKKY Incorporated 17715 Breconwood Road Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | ||
For all designated states Mikkelsen, John P. SKKY Incorporated 17715 Breconwood Road Wayzata, MN 55391 / US | |||
For all designated states Freidson, Robert I. 25 Kamennoostrovsky Ave., Apt. 61 Sint Petersburg 197101 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikkelsen, John P. c/o SKKY, LLC 888 Colwell Building 123 North Third Street Minneapolis, MN 55401 / US | 02 /
Freidson, Robert I. 25 Kamennoostrovsky Ave., Apt. 61 197101 Saint Petersburg / RU | [2016/46] |
Former [2012/12] | 01 /
Mikkelsen, John P. SKKY Incorporated 17715 Breconwood Road Wayzata, MN Minnesota 55391 / US | ||
02 /
Freidson, Robert I. 25 Kamennoostrovsky Ave., Apt. 61 197101 Saint Petersburg / RU | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Grund, Martin, et al Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11193089.7 | 26.06.2002 | [2012/12] | Priority number, date | US200130168101P | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 30168101 P | US200130311501P | 03.07.2001 Original published format: US 30311501 P | US200131245001P | 14.08.2001 Original published format: US 31245001 P | US200134315901P | 26.10.2001 Original published format: US 34315901 P | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2432190 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2432190 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G06Q30/04 (EP,US);
H04M3/42051 (EP,US);
G06F16/182 (EP,US);
G06Q20/123 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0633 (EP,US);
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US);
H04L27/2656 (EP,US);
H04L65/1059 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US);
H04M1/72442 (EP,US);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04W4/16 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/60 (EP,US);
H04W8/00 (EP,US);
H04L67/289 (EP,US);
H04L67/565 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Medienablieferungsplattform | [2012/12] | English: | Improved media delivery platform | [2012/12] | French: | Plate-forme de distribution de contenus de supports ameliorée | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/39] | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35] | 27.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02746738.0 / EP1438669 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020746738) is 01.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.2012 | 30.06.2013 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9636141 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-5,13 * page 7, line 3 - line 23; figures 1,4 * * page 11, line 17 - line 18 * [I] 6-12,14,15; | [A]EP1091543 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A] - BAUER S ET AL, "THE MPEG-4 MULTIMEDIA CODING STANDARD: ALGORITHMS, ARCHITECTURES AND APPLICATIONS", JOURNAL OF VLSI SIGNAL PROCESSING SYSTEMS FOR SIGNAL, IMAGE, AND VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19991001), vol. 23, no. 1, doi:10.1023/A:1008136602091, ISSN 0922-5773, pages 7 - 26, XP000862769 [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [4.2.1] , [ 4.2.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008136602091 | by applicant | US5918213 | US5926789 | US5949411 | US5963916 |