EP2463467 - Narrow three-position actuating device for controlling a parallel movement of a door- or window-wing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Wilhelm-Hautau Strasse 2 31691 Helpsen / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states HAUTAU GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 56-60 31691 Helpsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muegge, Dirk Untere Strasse 24 31688 Nienstaedt / DE | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Kleine, Hubertus, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Leonhard, Frank Reimund Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11193121.8 | 12.12.2011 | [2012/24] | Priority number, date | DE20101061173 | 11.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010061173 | [2012/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2463467 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2463467 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/18, E05B15/02, E05C17/00 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05B15/022 (EP);
E05C17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schmale Drei-Wege-Steuervorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Parallel-Abstellung eines Tuer- oder Fensterfluegels | [2012/24] | English: | Narrow three-position actuating device for controlling a parallel movement of a door- or window-wing | [2012/24] | French: | Fin dispositif de commande à trois positions pour le réglage parallèle d'un battant de porte ou de fenêtre | [2012/24] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1582673 (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [AD] 1,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1582673 | EP1580375 | DE202005018950U |