blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2465907

EP2465907 - Optical pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet, liquid crystal display and input device comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.08.2018
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nitto Denko Corporation
1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi
Osaka 567-8680 / JP
[2012/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Katami, Hirofumi
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
02 / Banba, Tomohide
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
03 / Takarada, Shou
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
04 / Fujita, Masato
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
05 / Nonaka, Takahiro
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
06 / Kishioka, Hiroaki
1-1-2, Shimohozumi
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date11193381.814.12.2011
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateJP2010027884715.12.2010         Original published format: JP 2010278847
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2465907
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2012
ClassificationIPC:C09J7/00, C09J7/02, C09J133/06
[2012/25]
CPC:
C09J7/10 (EP,US); C09J7/385 (EP,KR,US); C08K5/54 (KR);
C09J11/00 (KR); C09J133/08 (EP,US); G02F1/13338 (EP,US);
G06F3/044 (KR); B32B2457/202 (US); C08L2312/06 (EP,US);
C09J2203/318 (EP,KR,US); C09J2301/312 (EP,US); C09J2301/416 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,KR,US); C09K2323/05 (EP,US); C09K2323/057 (EP,US);
G02F2202/28 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Optische druckempfindliche Klebefolie, Flüssigkristallanzeige und Eingabevorrichtung damit[2012/25]
English:Optical pressure-sensitive adhesive sheet, liquid crystal display and input device comprising the same[2012/25]
French:Feuille adhésive sensible à la pression optique, écran à cristaux liquides et dispositif d'entrée les comportant[2012/25]
Examination procedure17.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2012Examination requested  [2013/07]
30.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.07.2018
31.07.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/02]
31.08.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/02]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
21.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1956064  (SOKEN KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraph [0019] - paragraphs [0025] , [0039]; example -; claims 1,4,5; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]EP2169024  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037]; example -; claims 1,2,4-7 *;
 [XP]WO2010147047  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP], et al) [XP] 1-10 * abstract * * example 1; claim - *
by applicantJP2002363523
 JP2010278847
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.