12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
08.07.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
13.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
05.06.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] |
13.05.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
23.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
27.06.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] |
20.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.01.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.11.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
29.11.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] |
26.07.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
18.06.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |