EP2433523 - Single patient, personal use air mattress having a single perimeter seam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodlark Circle, Inc. 2261 Woodlark Circle Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2012/13] | For all designated states Woodlark Circle, Inc. 2261 Woodlark Circle Bethlehem, PA 18017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davis, David T. 2261 Woodlark Circle Bethlehem, PA Pennsylvania 18017 / US | [2012/13] | Representative(s) | Leonhard, Frank Reimund, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [2014/18] |
Former [2013/24] | Weyand, Tim, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Weyand, Tim, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11193626.6 | 04.04.2007 | [2012/13] | Priority number, date | US20060279359 | 11.04.2006 Original published format: US 279359 | [2012/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2433523 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2433523 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/08 | [2012/13] | CPC: |
A61G1/013 (EP,US);
A61G7/1026 (EP,US);
A61G7/1028 (EP,US);
A61G7/05769 (EP,US);
A61G7/1021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/13] | Title | German: | Luftmatratze zur persönlichen Verwendung mit einem Patienten mit einer einzigen Rundnaht | [2012/13] | English: | Single patient, personal use air mattress having a single perimeter seam | [2012/13] | French: | Matelas pneumatique personnel pour un seul patient ayant une seule soudure sur le périmètre | [2012/13] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/13] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07760098.9 / EP2018110 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2007 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.04.2007 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5067189 (WEEDLING ROBERT E [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-6 * abstract *; | [Y]US5483709 (FOSTER L DALE [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-6 * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 7 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5655239 (CAPARON CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al) [A] 1-6* abstract *; | [Y]WO0009064 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [Y] 1,3-6 * abstract * * page 38 - page 47 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US6898809 (DAVIS DAVID T [US]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4517690 | US5561873 | US6073291 |