EP2431313 - Paper-sheet-thickness detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glory Ltd. 3-1, Shimoteno 1-Chome Himeji-Shi Hyogo 670-0063 / JP | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muranaka, Mitsuhiko c/o Glory Ltd. 3-1, Shimoteno 1-Chome, Himeji-Shi Hyogo 670-0063 / JP | 02 /
Ogawa, Kazuhito c/o Glory Ltd. 3-1, Shimoteno 1-Chome, Himeji-Shi Hyogo 670-0063 / JP | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11193662.1 | 31.08.2007 | [2012/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431313 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431313 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H7/02, G07D7/16 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G07D7/164 (EP,US);
B65H7/12 (EP,US);
B65H2220/09 (EP,US);
B65H2404/14 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1421 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1521 (EP,US);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2511/16 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/03 (US,EP);
B65H2511/16, B65H2220/03 (EP,US);
B65H2511/22, B65H2220/01 (EP);
B65H2515/84, B65H2220/03 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Papierdickenerfassungsvorrichtung | [2013/36] | English: | Paper-sheet-thickness detecting device | [2012/12] | French: | Détecteur d'épaisseur de papier | [2013/36] |
Former [2012/12] | Papierdickenerfassungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2012/12] | Détecteur d'épaisseur de papier | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 19.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07806909.3 / EP2184242 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.08.2007 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BE | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | GB | 31.08.2014 | IE | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | LU | 31.08.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/29] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
IE | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
GB | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
LU | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BE | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0025976 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]JPH0661850U ; | [X]EP1471470 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1542173 (HITACHI OMURON TERMINAL SOLUTI [JP]); | [A]DE102004030618 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]JP2007001739 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) | by applicant | JPH0649442U | JPH10283520 |