EP2466703 - Device for emitting a laser beam with anti-transverse lasing and with longitudinal cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2018/51] |
Former [2012/25] | For all designated states Thales 45, rue de Villiers 92200 Neuilly Sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Branly, Stéphane 39 rue du Quésu 91150 Brieres-les-Scelles / FR | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Henriot, Marie-Pierre, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2012/25] | Application number, filing date | 11193845.2 | 15.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | FR20100004945 | 17.12.2010 Original published format: FR 1004945 | [2012/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2466703 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2466703 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/042, H01S3/06 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H01S3/0604 (EP,US);
H01S3/04 (KR);
H01S3/042 (EP,US);
H01S5/024 (KR);
H01S2301/02 (EP,US);
H01S3/025 (EP,US);
H01S3/0404 (EP,US);
H01S3/0407 (EP,US);
H01S3/08045 (EP,US);
H01S3/08072 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2012/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aussenden von Laserstrahlenbündeln zum transversalen Antilasern und zur Längsabkühlung | [2012/25] | English: | Device for emitting a laser beam with anti-transverse lasing and with longitudinal cooling | [2012/25] | French: | Dispositif d'émission d'un faisceau laser anti lasage transverse et à refroidissement longitudinal | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3631362 (ALMASI JOSEPH C, et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 ** the whole document *; | US4225826 [ ] (LEWIS OWEN, et al); | [A]US2005058173 (VETROVEC JAN [US]) [A] 1-7 * figures 3,5,12,15 * * paragraph [0090] *; | [AD]FR2877776 (THALES SA [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR2901067 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A] - VETROVEC J, "DIODE-PUMPED ACTIVE MIRROR AMPLIFIER FOR HIGH-AVERAGE POWER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LASERS, XX, XX, (20001204), pages 776 - 783, XP008006316 [A] 1-7 * figures 2,4 * * the whole document * | [A] - GUCH S, "PARASITIC SUPPRESSION IN LARGE APERTURE DISK LASERS EMPLOYING LIQUID EDGE CLADDINGS", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19760601), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1364/AO.15.001453, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 1453 - 1457, XP002419100 [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.15.001453 | [A] - KELLY J H ET AL, "HIGH-REPETITION-RATE CR:ND:GSGG ACTIVE-MIRROR AMPLIFIER", OPTICS LETTERS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19871201), vol. 12, no. 12, doi:10.1364/OL.12.000996, ISSN 0146-9592, pages 996 - 998, XP002069938 [A] 1-7 * figure 1 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OL.12.000996 | by applicant | FR2901067 | FR20040011815 | FR20040013734 |