Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012153710 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | US201113329097 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012153587 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113329973 | 19.12.2011 | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012153585 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | US201113328938 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8313113 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2012153584 | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | US201113329034 | 16.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2465749 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2465748 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2465747 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011265345 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011256906 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011256905 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011256904 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | US38125810 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA140978S | 25.01.2012 | S | Priority number | Date | US38125810 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2762467 | 16.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2762543 | 17.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012000025 | 18.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US42405310 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012000027 | 06.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201061424478 | 17.12.2010 | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USD644395S | 30.08.2011 | S | Priority number | Date | US38125810 | 16.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2465746 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2762195 | 17.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012000024 | 18.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201061424421 | 17.12.2010 |