EP2465746 - Expandable and convertible hand trucks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DG Manufacturing, LLC 3535 North Rock Road Suite 300 Wichita, KS 67226 / US | [2012/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Paul 14201 East Sundance Wichita, KS Kansas 67230 / US | 02 /
Wood, Robert Allen 2433 South 55th Street Lincoln, NE Nebraska 68506 / US | [2012/25] | Representative(s) | Lunt, Mark George Francis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Lunt, Mark George Francis Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11194075.5 | 16.12.2011 | [2012/25] | Priority number, date | US201061424421P | 17.12.2010 Original published format: US 201061424421 P | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/25] | US201013424421 | 17.12.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2465746 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Classification | IPC: | B62B1/00, B62B1/12, B62B5/06 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
B62B1/125 (EP,US);
B62B1/002 (EP,US);
B62B1/12 (EP,US);
B62B3/02 (EP,US);
B62B5/067 (EP,US);
B62B2206/02 (EP,US);
B62B5/061 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verlängerbare und umwandelbare Handwägen | [2012/25] | English: | Expandable and convertible hand trucks | [2012/25] | French: | Chariots élévateurs extensibles et convertibles | [2012/25] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 14.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |