EP2439861 - Transmitter apparatus for communications system using multiple antennas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | Opposition rejected | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imamura, Kimihiko 620 SE, 168th Avenue, Y104 Vancouver, WA Washington 98684 / US | 02 /
Nogami, Toshizo A-121, 2-24-7, Honda-cho Midori-ku, Chiba-shi Chiba-ken, Chiba / JP | 03 /
Yamada, Ryota 2876-11-No.225, Kamatori-cho Midori-ku, Chiba-shi Chiba-ken, Chiba / JP | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/15] | Treeby, Philip David William R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London Greater London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11194160.5 | 19.12.2006 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | JP20050366590 | 20.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005366590 | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439861 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439861 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439861 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H04B7/0671 (EP,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04B7/0682 (EP,US);
H04B7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | Sender Vorrichtung für Übertragungssystem mit mehreren Antennen | [2012/15] | English: | Transmitter apparatus for communications system using multiple antennas | [2012/15] | French: | Appareil émetteur pour un système de communication avec antennes multiples | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06842886.1 / EP1965509 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060842886) is 27.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
07.07.2016
WITHDRAWN Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Kribber, Klaus-Dieter, et al, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
22.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Kribber, Klaus-Dieter, et al, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | ||
Former [2016/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
22.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.07.2014
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE Opponent's representative Meier, Florian Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | 08.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.12.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2016 | 12.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.12.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.12.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2006 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | IE | 19.12.2013 | LU | 19.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 19.12.2006 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 19.12.2006 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 19.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5991331 (CHENNAKESHU SANDEEP [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 6 - line 25 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 26 *; | [A]WO0154305 (IOSPAN WIRELESS INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph 6 * * page 7, paragraph 7 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 5 - page 13, paragraph 2 *; | [A]WO0207341 (IP ACCESS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 5 *; | [A]WO2005117321 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 9 - paragraph 13 * * page 11, paragraph 48 - page 13, paragraph 53 * * page 14, paragraph 57 - page 15, paragraph 62 * * page 18, paragraph 78 - page 19, paragraph 81 *; | [A] - AUER G, "Channel estimation by set partitioning for OFDM with cyclic delay diversity", 2004 IEEE 60TH VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. VTC2004-FALL - 26-29 SEPT. 2004 - LOS ANGELES, CA, USA, IEEE - PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA LNKD- DOI:10.1109/VETECF.2004.1400092, (20040926), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8521-4, pages 669 - 673, XP010788461 [A] 1 * page 669, column l, paragraph 1 - page 670, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2004.1400092 | by applicant | - "Downlink Multiple Access Scheme for Evolved UTRA", 3GPP, (20050404), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/TDG_RAN/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_40bis/Docs/R1-050249.zip | - "Physical Channel and Multiplexing in Evolved UTRA Downlink", 3GPP, (20050620), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/TSG_ RAN/WG1_ RL1/R1 Ad_ Hocs/LTE AH_ JUNE-OS/Docs/R1-05 0590.zip | - "Intra-Node B Macro Diversity Using Simultaneous Transmission with Soft-combining in Evolved UTRA Downlink", 3GPP, (20050829), URL: np://np.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_42/Docs/R1-050700.zip |