Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] |
27.07.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.02.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.01.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.07.2012 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
04.07.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
01.06.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
01.06.2012 | First examination report | |
13.04.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |