EP2607875 - Pressure sensor through which a fluid flows and fluid delivery device with same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ViscoTec Pumpen- und Dosiertechnik GmbH Amperstraße 13 84513 Töging a. Inn / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gantenhammer, Vinzenz Lanterdingerstrasse 1a 84453 Mühldorf / DE | 02 /
Kirmeier, Andreas Huber am Ort 8 84513 Töging am Inn / DE | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/26] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Elsenheimerstrasse 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11194612.5 | 20.12.2011 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607875 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607875 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00, G01L19/00, G01L19/06 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G01L19/0023 (EP);
G01L19/0645 (EP);
G01L19/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2013/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Durchströmter Drucksensor und Fördereinrichtung mit einem durchströmten Drucksensor | [2013/26] | English: | Pressure sensor through which a fluid flows and fluid delivery device with same | [2013/26] | French: | Capteur de pression d'un fluide en écoulement et distributeur de fluide doté d'un tel capteur de pression | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 28.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2011 | AL | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.12.2011 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9739679 (SUNSCOPE INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,12,14,15 * page 6, line 19 - page 17, line 16; figure - * [I] 4,5,9,11,13; | [XI]EP0124308 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10,13-15 * page 3, line 23 - page 8, line 31; figure -; claim 6 * [I] 5,9,11,12 |