Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
05.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
30.03.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.02.2016 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.07.2015 | Publication of search report | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
17.07.2015 | Change - classification | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
18.02.2015 | Change - representative | |
23.12.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.12.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.08.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
27.06.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] |