Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9099927 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2015 | B2 | US2012161514 | 28.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20100134867 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20120072933 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100134867 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102570803 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20100134867 | 24.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2469697 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2015 | A3 | EP2469697 | 27.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20100134867 | 24.12.2010 |